EP3388941 - COMPARATIVE MULTI-FORECASTING ANALYTICS SERVICE STACK FOR CLOUD COMPUTING RESOURCE ALLOCATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 14.07.2023 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.06.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.03.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.2023 | Refusal of application | published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Accenture Global Solutions Limited 3 Grand Canal Plaza Dublin 4 / IE | [2020/28] |
Former [2018/42] | For all designated states Accenture Global Services Limited 3 Grand Canal Plaza Lower Grand Canal Street Upper Dublin 4 Dublin / IE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SRINIVASAN, Madhan Kumar 821/C, 2nd Floor, 25th Cross, 24th Main Sector 2, HSR Layout Bangalore 560102 Karnataka / IN | 02 /
PV, Guruprasad 205, Block 1, Anriya Dwellington 7th Cross Road, RMV Extension Stage 2, Bengaluru 560094 Karnataka / IN | [2018/42] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/42] | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 17179012.4 | 30.06.2017 | [2018/42] | Priority number, date | IN201741013376 | 14.04.2017 Original published format: IN201741013376 | [2018/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3388941 | Date: | 17.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/50 | [2018/42] | CPC: |
G06F9/5027 (EP,US);
H04L41/14 (US);
G06F9/45558 (US);
G06F9/5016 (US);
G06F2009/45595 (US);
H04L67/10 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/17] |
Former [2018/42] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SERVICE-STACK ZUR VERGLEICHENDEN MEHRFACHVORHERSAGEANALYSE ZUR ZUWEISUNG VON CLOUD-COMPUTING-RESSOURCEN | [2018/42] | English: | COMPARATIVE MULTI-FORECASTING ANALYTICS SERVICE STACK FOR CLOUD COMPUTING RESOURCE ALLOCATION | [2018/42] | French: | EMPILEMENT DE SERVICE ANALYTIQUE DE PRÉVISIONS COMPARATIVES MULTIPLES POUR ATTRIBUTION DE RESSOURCES INFORMATIQUE EN NUAGE | [2018/42] | Examination procedure | 18.03.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.03.2019 | Examination requested [2019/17] | 18.03.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.02.2023 | 09.02.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 28.03.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2023/33] | 07.04.2023 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2023/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2015288573 (BAUGHMAN AARON K [US], et al) [I] 1-20 * paragraph [0003]; figure 4 * * paragraphs [0016] - [0021] * * paragraph [0055] * * paragraphs [0064] - [0067] * * figure 5 * * paragraph [0082] ** paragraph [0110] * |