EP3254981 - METHOD FOR STORING AND SHIPPING A BOX [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.05.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.06.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.01.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.09.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.06.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Embalajes Capsa, S. L. Plaça Pere Llauger i Prim 8 - Nau 4 Pol. Ind. Can Misser 08360 Canet De Mar / ES | [2017/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOPEZ MASAGUE, Manuel EMBALAJES CAPSA, S.L. Pl. Pere Llauger i Prim, 8 nave 4 Pol. Ind. Can Misser 08360 CANET DE MAR (Barcelona) / ES | [2017/50] | Representative(s) | Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Edificio Aqua - Agustín de Foxá, 4-10 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2017/50] | Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Cedaceros, 1 28014 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 17179251.8 | 25.05.2012 | [2017/50] | Priority number, date | EP20110382171 | 26.05.2011 Original published format: EP 11382171 | [2017/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3254981 | Date: | 13.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3254981 | Date: | 06.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B65D5/02, B65D5/10, B65D5/54 | [2017/50] | CPC: |
B65D5/10 (EP,KR,US);
B65D5/02 (KR,RU);
B65D5/0227 (EP,US);
B65D5/42 (US);
B65D5/4608 (US);
B65D5/54 (KR);
B65D5/541 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/30] |
Former [2017/50] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM LAGERN UND VERSENDEN EINER SCHACHTEL | [2017/50] | English: | METHOD FOR STORING AND SHIPPING A BOX | [2017/50] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE STOCKAGE ET D'EXPÉDITION D'UNE BOÎTE | [2017/50] | Examination procedure | 03.07.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/30] | 18.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.04.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 06.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.05.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 19.05.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.05.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12729718.2 / EP2714529 | Divisional application(s) | EP22182768.6 / EP4091952 | Opposition(s) | 11.04.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/24] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 06.06.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 06.06.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.06.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 06.07.2022 | AT | 06.07.2022 | CZ | 06.07.2022 | DK | 06.07.2022 | EE | 06.07.2022 | FI | 06.07.2022 | HR | 06.07.2022 | LT | 06.07.2022 | LV | 06.07.2022 | MC | 06.07.2022 | RO | 06.07.2022 | RS | 06.07.2022 | SE | 06.07.2022 | SI | 06.07.2022 | SK | 06.07.2022 | SM | 06.07.2022 | NO | 06.10.2022 | GR | 07.10.2022 | IS | 06.11.2022 | [2024/08] |
Former [2023/37] | AL | 06.07.2022 | |
AT | 06.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
DK | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SI | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 06.07.2022 | |
AT | 06.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
DK | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 06.07.2022 | |
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
DK | 06.07.2022 | ||
EE | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SK | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 06.07.2022 | |
CZ | 06.07.2022 | ||
DK | 06.07.2022 | ||
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
RO | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 06.07.2022 | |
FI | 06.07.2022 | ||
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 06.07.2022 | |
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
SM | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | FI | 06.07.2022 | |
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
IS | 06.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 06.07.2022 | |
HR | 06.07.2022 | ||
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
GR | 07.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 06.07.2022 | |
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
LV | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 06.07.2022 | |
LT | 06.07.2022 | ||
RS | 06.07.2022 | ||
SE | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.10.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US1869742 (EDMUNDS LOUIS L) [I] 1-8 * page 1, line 86 - page 2, line 38; figures 1-5 *; | [I]FR1189297 (MICHELS A) [I] 1-8 * page 2, column 1, paragraph 4; figures 1-2 *; | [I]FR1578148 (SCHISSELE P) [I] 1-8 * page 3, line 19 - page 4, line 8; figures 1-7 *; | [I]US2003201315 (JAMISON GEORGE D [US], et al) [I] 1-8 * page 2, paragraph 34 - page 4, paragraph 49; figures 1-15 *; | [I]JP3138515U (*) [I] 1-8* figures 9-11 * | by applicant | US1869742 | FR1189297 | FR1578148 | US2003201315 |