Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3267153 | Global Dossier | 19.12.2018 | B1 | EP3267153 | 10.01.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102016212426 | 07.07.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102016212426 | 16.08.2018 | B4 | DE102016212426 | 11.01.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102016212426 | 07.07.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2707380T | 03.04.2019 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE102016212426 | 07.07.2016 |