EP3255116 - COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING HFC-1234YF AND HFC-32 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/50] | COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING A FLUOROOLEFIN | ||
[2019/08] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.06.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.01.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.10.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Chemours Company FC, LLC 1007 Market Street Wilmington DE 19801 / US | [2017/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rao, Velliyur Nott Mallikarjuna "-" Deceased / US | 02 /
Minor, Barbara Haviland 233 Greenhaven Drive Elkton, MD 21921 / US | [2019/27] |
Former [2017/50] | 01 /
Rao, Velliyur Nott Mallikarjuna 1 Georgetown Avenue Wilmington, DE 19809 / US | ||
02 /
Minor, Barbara Haviland 233 Greenhaven Drive Elkton, MD 21921 / US | Representative(s) | Abitz & Partner, et al Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | [2024/16] |
Former [2017/50] | Dannenberger, Oliver Andre, et al Abitz & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Arabellastrasse 17 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17179485.2 | 03.03.2006 | [2017/50] | Priority number, date | US20050658543P | 04.03.2005 Original published format: US 658543 P | US20050710439P | 23.08.2005 Original published format: US 710439 P | US20050732769P | 01.11.2005 Original published format: US 732769 P | [2017/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3255116 | Date: | 13.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3255116 | Date: | 10.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/28] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP3255116 | Date: | 17.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C09K5/04, C10M171/00 | [2017/50] | CPC: |
C10M171/008 (EP);
C08J9/146 (EP);
C08J9/149 (EP);
C09K5/045 (EP);
C08J2203/12 (EP);
C08J2203/14 (EP);
C08J2203/162 (EP);
C08J2203/182 (EP);
C08J2207/04 (EP);
C08J2375/04 (EP);
C09K2205/126 (EP);
C09K2205/22 (EP);
C09K2205/32 (EP);
C09K2205/40 (EP);
C10M2203/065 (EP);
C10M2203/1006 (EP);
C10M2205/0206 (EP);
C10M2207/2835 (EP);
C10M2209/043 (EP);
C10M2209/1033 (EP);
C10N2020/101 (EP);
C10N2020/103 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/50] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT EINEM FLUOROLEFIN | [2022/13] | English: | COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING HFC-1234YF AND HFC-32 | [2019/08] | French: | COMPOSITIONS COMPORTANT UNE FLUOROLÉFINE | [2022/13] |
Former [2017/50] | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT EINEM FLUOROLEFIN | ||
Former [2017/50] | COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING A FLUOROOLEFIN | ||
Former [2017/50] | COMPOSITIONS COMPORTANT UNE FLUOROLÉFINE | Examination procedure | 04.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/50] | 04.07.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.05.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06737345.6 / EP1853679 | EP08014611.1 / EP1985680 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
09.04.2020
13.09.2023
WITHDRAWN Mexichem Fluor S.A. de C.V. Eje 106 (sin número) Zona Industrial C.P. 78395 San Luis Potosi, S.L.P. / MX Opponent's representative Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [2023/43] |
Former [2020/20] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.04.2020
ADMISSIBLE Mexichem Fluor S.A. de C.V. Eje 106 (sin número) Zona Industrial C.P. 78395 San Luis Potosi, S.L.P. / MX Opponent's representative Potter Clarkson The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | 18.06.2020 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 17.12.2020 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 17.02.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.03.2022 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 07.03.2022 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 07.12.2023 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 22.12.2023 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 12.03.2024 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 05.05.2022 | Appeal received No. T1186/22 | 05.05.2022 | Payment of appeal fee | 14.07.2022 | Statement of grounds filed | 07.12.2023 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | 05.05.2022 | Appeal received No. T1186/22 | 05.05.2022 | Payment of appeal fee | 07.07.2022 | Statement of grounds filed | 07.12.2023 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 04.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 04.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 04.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 04.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 22.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 10.07.2019 | DK | 10.07.2019 | MC | 10.07.2019 | IS | 10.11.2019 | LU | 03.03.2020 | [2022/28] |
Former [2021/04] | DK | 10.07.2019 | |
MC | 10.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
LU | 03.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | DK | 10.07.2019 | |
MC | 10.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | DK | 10.07.2019 | |
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/24] | DK | 10.07.2019 | |
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | DK | 10.07.2019 | |
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | IS | 10.11.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH04110388 ; | [A]US2004089839 (THOMAS RAYMOND H [US], et al); | by applicant | US5759430 | USRE36951E | US20040910495 | US20050062044 | Opposition | JPH04110388 | US6150306 | US6516837 | WO2004037913 | US2004256594 | WO2005103190 | WO2005105947 |