EP3424301 - METHOD FOR DETERMINING A CONTAMINATION STATE OF AT LEAST ONE COMPONENT OF A GARDENING AND/OR FORESTRY DEVICE AND GARDENING AND/OR FORESTRY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.03.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.07.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Andreas Stihl AG & Co. KG Badstrasse 115 71336 Waiblingen / DE | [2019/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Frey, Benjamin Lessingstrasse 51 73663 Berglen / DE | 02 /
Reinert, Michael Brühlstrasse 4 73635 Rudersberg / DE | 03 /
Hollmeier, Friedrich Gaisbergweg 13/1 73635 Rudersberg / DE | 04 /
Eppinger, Andreas Merkleweg 4 70599 Stuttgart / DE | 05 /
Fernandez Krämer, Antonio Immenhofer Strasse 26 70180 Stuttgart / DE | [2019/02] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB Kronenstraße 30 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [2019/02] | Application number, filing date | 17179675.8 | 04.07.2017 | [2019/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3424301 | Date: | 09.01.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A01G20/47 | [2019/02] | CPC: |
G01N33/0062 (EP,US);
A01G3/085 (EP,CN,US);
B25F5/00 (EP);
G01D21/02 (CN);
G01N33/0068 (EP,US);
A01G20/47 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/32] |
Former [2019/02] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ERMITTELN EINES VERSCHMUTZUNGSZUSTANDS MINDESTENS EINER KOMPONENTE EINES GARTEN- UND/ODER FORSTGERÄTS UND GARTEN- UND/ODER FORSTGERÄTESYSTEM | [2019/02] | English: | METHOD FOR DETERMINING A CONTAMINATION STATE OF AT LEAST ONE COMPONENT OF A GARDENING AND/OR FORESTRY DEVICE AND GARDENING AND/OR FORESTRY SYSTEM | [2019/02] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION D'UN ÉTAT DE POLLUTION D'AU MOINS UN COMPOSANT D'UN APPAREIL DE JARDINAGE ET/OU FORESTIER ET SYSTÈME D'APPAREIL FORESTIER ET/OU DE JARDINAGE | [2019/02] | Examination procedure | 01.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/32] | 01.07.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE102012112833 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-8,13-15 * § [0003-0006, 0011, 0018, 0019, 0023];; figures 1-2, 9; claim 1 * [A] 9-12; | [XA]DE102012224429 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,6,8,12-15 * § [0011, 0013, 0032, 0033];; figure 1; claims 1-6 * [A] 4,7,9-11; | [XA]WO2015110245 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-4,6-11,13-15 * page 15, line 1 - line 15; figures 1,4-6 * * page 20, line 4 * * page 3, line 16 - line 30 * * page 2, line 25 - page 3, line 15 * * page 20, line 1 - line 10 * * page 18, line 20 - line 25 * * page 13, line 15 - line 20 * * page 20, line 26 - line 30 * * page 12, line 20 - page 13, line 26 * [A] 5,12; | [XA]DE102015226796 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-4,6,8,13-15 * § [0007, 0008, 0009, 0026];; figure 1 * [A] 5,7,9-12; | [XA]DE102015217053 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-8,12-15 * § [0003, 0004, 0032, 0038, 0041, 0045-0048, 0051];; figure 1 * [A] 9-11; | [A]DE102015217825 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-15* § [0008, 0031] * |