EP3369537 - HANDLING DEVICE FOR AN APPARATUS FOR THE ADDITIVE MANUFACTURE OF THREE-DIMENSIONAL OBJECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.06.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.09.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.01.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CL Schutzrechtsverwaltungs GmbH An der Zeil 2 96215 Lichtenfels / DE | [2018/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schödel, Frank Nikolaus-Schmidt-Straße 8 96317 Kronach / DE | 02 /
Stammberger, Jens Gnaileser Straße 55 96472 Rödental / DE | [2018/36] | Representative(s) | Hafner & Kohl PartmbB Schleiermacherstraße 25 90491 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/36] | Hafner & Kohl Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Schleiermacherstraße 25 90491 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 17179847.3 | 05.07.2017 | [2018/36] | Priority number, date | DE201710104303 | 01.03.2017 Original published format: DE102017104303 | [2018/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3369537 | Date: | 05.09.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B25J21/02, B08B15/02, B22F3/105 | [2018/36] | CPC: |
B25J21/02 (EP,US);
B08B15/026 (EP,US);
B22F10/00 (CN);
B22F10/28 (EP,CN,US);
B22F12/38 (EP,CN,US);
B22F12/88 (EP,CN,US);
B22F12/90 (EP,CN,US);
B23K26/127 (US);
B29C64/153 (US);
B29C64/307 (US);
B29C64/379 (EP);
B33Y30/00 (EP,US);
B33Y40/20 (EP,CN,US);
C04B35/622 (CN);
B22F10/68 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/09] |
Former [2018/36] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HANDHABUNGSEINRICHTUNG FÜR EINE VORRICHTUNG ZUR ADDITIVEN HERSTELLUNG DREIDIMENSIONALER OBJEKTE | [2018/36] | English: | HANDLING DEVICE FOR AN APPARATUS FOR THE ADDITIVE MANUFACTURE OF THREE-DIMENSIONAL OBJECTS | [2018/36] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MANIPULATION POUR UN DISPOSITIF DE FABRICATION ADDITIVE D'OBJETS TRIDIMENSIONNELS | [2018/36] | Examination procedure | 16.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.01.2019 | Examination requested [2019/09] | 16.01.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/27] | 23.02.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2314409 (POWDER SYSTEMS LTD [GB]) [X] 1,7,11 * page 4, line 24 - page 6, line 8 * * figure - *; | [IA]US2012052145 (CHEN CHIH-KAI [TW], et al) [I] 1-3,7-12 * paragraphs [0008] , [0019] - [0021] * * figures 1A,1B * [A] 4-6; | [A]US2012096773 (BOAST DAVID [GB], et al) [A] 8,10 * paragraphs [0068] , [0127] , [0128] ** figure 7 *; | [X]US2016288125 (LANG JOHN PHILIP [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7,11 * paragraph [0029] * * figure 11 * |