EP3266889 - ENHANCE DUCTILITY OF GAMMA TITANIUM ALUMINUM ALLOYS BY REDUCING INTERSTITIAL CONTENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.12.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.01.2019 [2019/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [2018/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAS, Gopal 16 Old Barge Road Simsbury, CT Connecticut 06070 / US | [2018/02] | Representative(s) | Dehns 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/02] | de Bresser, Sara Jean Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 17179909.1 | 06.07.2017 | [2018/02] | Priority number, date | US201615204092 | 07.07.2016 Original published format: US201615204092 | [2018/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3266889 | Date: | 10.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C22C14/00, C22F1/18 | [2018/02] | CPC: |
C22C14/00 (EP,US);
C22C1/00 (EP,US);
C22F1/183 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ERHÖHTE DUKTILITÄT VON GAMMA-TITAN-ALUMINIUM-LEGIERUNGEN DURCH REDUZIERUNG VON INTERSTITIELLEN ANTEILEN | [2018/02] | English: | ENHANCE DUCTILITY OF GAMMA TITANIUM ALUMINUM ALLOYS BY REDUCING INTERSTITIAL CONTENTS | [2018/02] | French: | AMÉLIORATION DE LA DUCTILITÉ D'ALLIAGES DE TITANE ALUMINIUM GAMMA PAR RÉDUCTION DE TENEURS INTERSTITIELLES | [2018/02] | Examination procedure | 11.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/04] | 06.09.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/04] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2014202601 (HELM DIETMAR [DE], et al) [X] 1-12 * paragraphs [0001] , [0004] , [0012] - [0016] - [0018] , [0026] *; | [XP]EP3109337 (MTU AERO ENGINES AG [DE]) [XP] 1-12 * paragraphs [0001] , [0009] , [0037] *; | [X]US2011277891 (CLEMENS HELMUT [AT], et al) [X] 1-12 * paragraphs [0015] - [0027] - [0036] - [0046] - [0124] *; | [X]EP2620517 (MTU AERO ENGINES GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-12 * paragraphs [0003] , [0021] - [0023]; claim 13 *; | [X]EP2851445 (MTU AERO ENGINES AG [DE]) [X] 1-12 * paragraphs [0009] - [0011] - [0013] * | [X] - B. P. BEWLAY ET AL, "TiAl alloys in commercial aircraft engines", MATERIALS AT HIGH TEMPERATURES., GB, (20160628), vol. 33, no. 4-5, doi:10.1080/09603409.2016.1183068, ISSN 0960-3409, pages 549 - 559, XP055425624 [X] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/09603409.2016.1183068 |