EP3282368 - PARALLEL PROCESSING-BASED TRANSLATION METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 15.01.2021 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.08.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 17.02.2021 [2021/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2018/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Hodong Samsung Advanced Institute of Technology, 130 Samsung-ro, Youngtong-gu, Suwon-si 16678 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Park, Youngki Samsung Advanced Institute of Technology, 130 Samsung-ro, Youngtong-gu, Suwon-si 16678 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Na, Hwidong Samsung Advanced Institute of Technology, 130 Samsung-ro, Youngtong-gu, Suwon-si 16678 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
Mun, Minyoung Samsung Advanced Institute of Technology, 130 Samsung-ro, Youngtong-gu, Suwon-si 16678 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 05 /
Song, Inchul Samsung Advanced Institute of Technology, 130 Samsung-ro, Youngtong-gu, Suwon-si 16678 Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2018/07] | Representative(s) | Grootscholten, Johannes A.M., et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [2018/07] | Application number, filing date | 17180037.8 | 06.07.2017 | [2018/07] | Priority number, date | KR20160101726 | 10.08.2016 Original published format: KR 20160101726 | [2018/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3282368 | Date: | 14.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/28 | [2018/07] | CPC: |
G06F40/58 (EP,CN,US);
G06F40/42 (CN);
G06F40/47 (US);
G06F16/3344 (EP,US);
G06F40/51 (US);
G06F40/53 (US);
G06N3/044 (EP,US);
G06N3/045 (EP,US);
G06N3/063 (EP,US);
G06N3/08 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUF PARALLELER VERARBEITUNG BASIERENDES ÜBERSETZUNGSVERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG | [2018/07] | English: | PARALLEL PROCESSING-BASED TRANSLATION METHOD AND APPARATUS | [2018/07] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRADUCTION BASÉ SUR UN TRAITEMENT PARALLÈLE ET APPAREIL | [2018/07] | Examination procedure | 06.07.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.08.2018 | Examination requested [2018/38] | 18.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.09.2020 | 10.09.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 30.09.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/07] | 10.10.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003115059 (JAYARATNE NEVILLE [AU]) [A] 1-14* the whole document *; | [I]US2011131032 (YANG SEONG II [KR], et al) [I] 1-14 * paragraphs [0008] , [0 30] *; | [A]US8527276 (SENIOR ANDREW WILLIAM [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A] - MOLDOVAN D ET AL, "SNAP: parallel processing applied to AI", COMPUTER, IEEE COMPUTER SOCIETY, USA, (19920501), vol. 25, no. 5, doi:10.1109/2.144394, ISSN 0018-9162, pages 39 - 49, XP011416471 [A] 1-14 * page 1, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/2.144394 | by applicant | KR20160101726 |