EP3425917 - A METHOD TO INSERT AD CONTENT INTO A VIDEO SCENE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.07.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Refusal of application | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nagravision Sàrl Route de Genève 22-24 1033 Cheseaux-sur-Lausanne / CH | [2022/36] |
Former [2019/02] | For all designated states Nagravision S.A. 22-24, route de Genève 1033 Cheseaux-sur-Lausanne / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STRANSKY-HEILKRON, Philippe Chemin des Grands-Champs 33 1033 Cheseaux-sur-Lausanne / CH | [2019/02] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/02] | Hoyng Rokh Monegier LLP Rembrandt Tower, 31st Floor Amstelplein 1 1096 HA Amsterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 17180263.0 | 07.07.2017 | [2019/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3425917 | Date: | 09.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/234, H04N21/2343, H04N21/2668, H04N21/44, H04N21/4402, H04N21/462, H04N21/81, H04N5/272, H04N21/431 | [2019/02] | CPC: |
H04N5/2723 (EP,US);
H04N21/23424 (US);
H04N21/23418 (EP,US);
H04N21/2343 (US);
H04N21/234345 (EP,US);
H04N21/25891 (US);
H04N21/2668 (EP,US);
H04N21/4316 (EP,US);
H04N21/4334 (US);
H04N21/44008 (EP,US);
H04N21/440245 (EP,US);
H04N21/4622 (EP,US);
H04N21/812 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/33] |
Former [2019/02] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM EINLEGEN VON WERBEINHALT IN EINE VIDEOSZENE | [2019/02] | English: | A METHOD TO INSERT AD CONTENT INTO A VIDEO SCENE | [2019/02] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'INSERTION D'UN CONTENU PUBLICITAIRE DANS UNE SCÈNE VIDÉO | [2019/02] | Examination procedure | 04.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/33] | 04.07.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.05.2022 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 12.05.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2024/25] | 26.04.2024 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2024/25] | Appeal following examination | 29.06.2022 | Appeal received No. T2218/22 | 29.06.2022 | Payment of appeal fee | 20.09.2022 | Statement of grounds filed | 26.04.2024 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | EP22206252.3 / EP4156694 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2003028873 (LEMMONS THOMAS [US]) [I] 1-11 * paragraphs [0064] - [0082] *; | [XI]EP2046043 (SONY COMP ENTERTAINMENT US [US]) [X] 1,4,10,11 * paragraphs [0032] - [0052]; figures 2a,2b * [I] 2,3,5-9; | [XI]US2015106845 (POPKIEWICZ MARK [GB], et al) [X] 1,4,10,11 * paragraphs [0193] - [0227] *[I] 2,3,5-9; | [XI]US2016212455 (MANNA PARBATI K [US]) [X] 1,4,10,11 * paragraphs [0031] , [0036] , [0037] , [0052] , [0056] * [I] 2,3,5-9 |