Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10427789 | Global Dossier | 01.10.2019 | B2 | US2018370632 | 27.12.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201710477043 | 21.06.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107284663B | Global Dossier | 20.06.2023 | B | CN107284663 | 24.10.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201710477043 | 21.06.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3417704 | Global Dossier | 06.05.2020 | B1 | EP3417704 | 26.12.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201710477043 | 21.06.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2563683 | 30.10.2019 | B | GB2563683 | 26.12.2018 | A | GB201711003D0 | 23.08.2017 | D0 | Priority number | Date | CN201710477043 | 21.06.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ733565 | 30.11.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201710477043 | 21.06.2017 |