EP3417704 - AN UNMANNED AERIAL VEHICLE USED IN FISHING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.2021 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.04.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ningbo Pelican Drone Co., Ltd. Room 128, No. 16 Building 1, Meishan Yanchang Beilun Ningbo Zhejiang 315800 / CN | [2020/19] |
Former [2018/52] | For all designated states Ningbo Pelican Drome Co., Ltd. Room 128, No. 16 Building 1, Meishan Yanchang Beilun Ningbo Zhejiang 315800 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAN, Tao 9 smythe av mont albert Melbourne, Victoria 3127 / AU | [2018/52] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Gierlich & Pischitzis Partnerschaft mbB Gerbermühlstraße 11 60594 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2018/52] | Application number, filing date | 17180397.6 | 07.07.2017 | [2018/52] | Priority number, date | CN201710477043 | 21.06.2017 Original published format: CN201710477043 | [2018/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3417704 | Date: | 26.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3417704 | Date: | 06.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A01K97/00, A01K79/00, A01K91/02, A01K97/02, B64D1/00, G05D1/00 | [2018/52] | CPC: |
A01K91/02 (EP,US);
A01K79/00 (CN,US);
A01K99/00 (GB,US);
B64D1/22 (US);
A01K83/00 (US);
A01K93/00 (US);
A01K93/02 (CN);
A01K97/02 (EP,US);
A01K97/125 (US);
B64D1/00 (US);
B64D1/02 (EP);
G01S15/96 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/19] |
Former [2018/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BEIM FISCHEN VERWENDETES UNBEMANNTES LUFTFAHRZEUG | [2018/52] | English: | AN UNMANNED AERIAL VEHICLE USED IN FISHING | [2018/52] | French: | VÉHICULE AÉRIEN SANS PILOTE UTILISÉ POUR LA PÊCHE | [2018/52] | Examination procedure | 18.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/52] | 18.06.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 09.02.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.07.2017 | AL | 06.05.2020 | AT | 06.05.2020 | CY | 06.05.2020 | CZ | 06.05.2020 | DK | 06.05.2020 | EE | 06.05.2020 | ES | 06.05.2020 | FI | 06.05.2020 | HR | 06.05.2020 | IT | 06.05.2020 | LT | 06.05.2020 | LV | 06.05.2020 | MC | 06.05.2020 | MK | 06.05.2020 | MT | 06.05.2020 | NL | 06.05.2020 | PL | 06.05.2020 | RO | 06.05.2020 | RS | 06.05.2020 | SE | 06.05.2020 | SI | 06.05.2020 | SK | 06.05.2020 | SM | 06.05.2020 | TR | 06.05.2020 | IE | 07.07.2020 | LU | 07.07.2020 | BE | 31.07.2020 | CH | 31.07.2020 | LI | 31.07.2020 | BG | 06.08.2020 | NO | 06.08.2020 | GR | 07.08.2020 | IS | 06.09.2020 | PT | 07.09.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 07.07.2017 | |
AL | 06.05.2020 | ||
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CY | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
MT | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
TR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IE | 07.07.2020 | ||
LU | 07.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
IE | 07.07.2020 | ||
LU | 07.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
IE | 07.07.2020 | ||
LU | 07.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/14] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 06.05.2020 | |
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 06.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN203387114U (HENGSHUI ZHONGXIANG ELECTRONIC TECHNOLOGY CO LTD, et al); | [IA]CN106305643 (WEIHAI XINGYU UAV TECH CO LTD) |