EP3293478 - COUNTER-FLOW CERAMIC HEAT EXCHANGER ASSEMBLY AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.11.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.12.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.09.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.06.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.09.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hamilton Sundstrand Corporation Four Coliseum Centre 2730 West Tyvola Road Charlotte, NC 28217 / US | [2021/47] |
Former [2018/11] | For all designated states Hamilton Sundstrand Corporation One Hamilton Road Windsor Locks, CT 06096-1010 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RANJAN, Ram 154 Mohawk Drive West Hartford, CT Connecticut 06117 / US | 02 /
WONG, Eva 138 Cambridge Drive Glastonbury, CT Connecticut 06033 / US | [2018/11] | Representative(s) | Dehns 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/03] | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2018/11] | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 17180878.5 | 12.07.2017 | [2018/11] | Priority number, date | US201615262888 | 12.09.2016 Original published format: US201615262888 | [2018/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3293478 | Date: | 14.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3293478 | Date: | 19.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F28F7/02, F28F21/04, F28F3/08, F28D9/00, F28F9/02 | [2018/11] | CPC: |
F28F21/04 (EP,US);
B32B3/266 (US);
F28D9/0062 (EP,US);
F28F3/08 (EP,US);
F28F7/02 (EP,US);
F28F9/0221 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/43] |
Former [2018/11] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KERAMISCHE GEGENSTROMWÄRMETAUSCHERANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN | [2018/11] | English: | COUNTER-FLOW CERAMIC HEAT EXCHANGER ASSEMBLY AND METHOD | [2018/11] | French: | ENSEMBLE ÉCHANGEUR DE CHALEUR EN CÉRAMIQUE À CONTRE-COURANT ET PROCÉDÉ | [2018/11] | Examination procedure | 12.07.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.09.2018 | Examination requested [2018/43] | 19.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.12.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 20.10.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.07.2017 | AL | 19.01.2022 | AT | 19.01.2022 | CY | 19.01.2022 | CZ | 19.01.2022 | DK | 19.01.2022 | EE | 19.01.2022 | ES | 19.01.2022 | FI | 19.01.2022 | HR | 19.01.2022 | IT | 19.01.2022 | LT | 19.01.2022 | LV | 19.01.2022 | MC | 19.01.2022 | MK | 19.01.2022 | MT | 19.01.2022 | NL | 19.01.2022 | PL | 19.01.2022 | RO | 19.01.2022 | RS | 19.01.2022 | SE | 19.01.2022 | SI | 19.01.2022 | SK | 19.01.2022 | SM | 19.01.2022 | TR | 19.01.2022 | BG | 19.04.2022 | NO | 19.04.2022 | GR | 20.04.2022 | IS | 19.05.2022 | PT | 19.05.2022 | IE | 12.07.2022 | LU | 12.07.2022 | BE | 31.07.2022 | CH | 31.07.2022 | LI | 31.07.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 12.07.2017 | |
AL | 19.01.2022 | ||
AT | 19.01.2022 | ||
CY | 19.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.01.2022 | ||
DK | 19.01.2022 | ||
EE | 19.01.2022 | ||
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
IT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
MC | 19.01.2022 | ||
MK | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RO | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
SI | 19.01.2022 | ||
SK | 19.01.2022 | ||
SM | 19.01.2022 | ||
TR | 19.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
IE | 12.07.2022 | ||
LU | 12.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 12.07.2017 | |
AL | 19.01.2022 | ||
AT | 19.01.2022 | ||
CY | 19.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.01.2022 | ||
DK | 19.01.2022 | ||
EE | 19.01.2022 | ||
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
IT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
MC | 19.01.2022 | ||
MK | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RO | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
SI | 19.01.2022 | ||
SK | 19.01.2022 | ||
SM | 19.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
IE | 12.07.2022 | ||
LU | 12.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 12.07.2017 | |
AL | 19.01.2022 | ||
AT | 19.01.2022 | ||
CY | 19.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.01.2022 | ||
DK | 19.01.2022 | ||
EE | 19.01.2022 | ||
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
IT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
MC | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RO | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
SI | 19.01.2022 | ||
SK | 19.01.2022 | ||
SM | 19.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
IE | 12.07.2022 | ||
LU | 12.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 12.07.2017 | |
AL | 19.01.2022 | ||
AT | 19.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.01.2022 | ||
DK | 19.01.2022 | ||
EE | 19.01.2022 | ||
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
IT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
MC | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RO | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
SI | 19.01.2022 | ||
SK | 19.01.2022 | ||
SM | 19.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
IE | 12.07.2022 | ||
LU | 12.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 19.01.2022 | |
AT | 19.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.01.2022 | ||
DK | 19.01.2022 | ||
EE | 19.01.2022 | ||
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
IT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
MC | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RO | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
SI | 19.01.2022 | ||
SK | 19.01.2022 | ||
SM | 19.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
IE | 12.07.2022 | ||
LU | 12.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 19.01.2022 | |
AT | 19.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.01.2022 | ||
DK | 19.01.2022 | ||
EE | 19.01.2022 | ||
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
MC | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RO | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
SI | 19.01.2022 | ||
SK | 19.01.2022 | ||
SM | 19.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
IE | 12.07.2022 | ||
LU | 12.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 19.01.2022 | |
AT | 19.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.01.2022 | ||
DK | 19.01.2022 | ||
EE | 19.01.2022 | ||
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
MC | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RO | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
SI | 19.01.2022 | ||
SK | 19.01.2022 | ||
SM | 19.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
LU | 12.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 19.01.2022 | |
AT | 19.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.01.2022 | ||
DK | 19.01.2022 | ||
EE | 19.01.2022 | ||
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
MC | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RO | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
SI | 19.01.2022 | ||
SK | 19.01.2022 | ||
SM | 19.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
LU | 12.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | AL | 19.01.2022 | |
AT | 19.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.01.2022 | ||
DK | 19.01.2022 | ||
EE | 19.01.2022 | ||
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
MC | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RO | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
SI | 19.01.2022 | ||
SK | 19.01.2022 | ||
SM | 19.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 19.01.2022 | |
AT | 19.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.01.2022 | ||
DK | 19.01.2022 | ||
EE | 19.01.2022 | ||
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RO | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
SI | 19.01.2022 | ||
SK | 19.01.2022 | ||
SM | 19.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 19.01.2022 | |
AT | 19.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 19.01.2022 | ||
DK | 19.01.2022 | ||
EE | 19.01.2022 | ||
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RO | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
SK | 19.01.2022 | ||
SM | 19.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 19.01.2022 | |
CZ | 19.01.2022 | ||
DK | 19.01.2022 | ||
EE | 19.01.2022 | ||
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RO | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
SK | 19.01.2022 | ||
SM | 19.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 19.01.2022 | |
CZ | 19.01.2022 | ||
DK | 19.01.2022 | ||
EE | 19.01.2022 | ||
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RO | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
SM | 19.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 19.01.2022 | |
DK | 19.01.2022 | ||
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RO | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
SM | 19.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 19.01.2022 | |
DK | 19.01.2022 | ||
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 19.01.2022 | |
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IS | 19.05.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AT | 19.01.2022 | |
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
FI | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 19.01.2022 | |
ES | 19.01.2022 | ||
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
LV | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
PL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
GR | 20.04.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | ES | 19.01.2022 | |
HR | 19.01.2022 | ||
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
RS | 19.01.2022 | ||
SE | 19.01.2022 | ||
BG | 19.04.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | ES | 19.01.2022 | |
LT | 19.01.2022 | ||
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
PT | 19.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 19.01.2022 | |
NL | 19.01.2022 | ||
NO | 19.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/30] | NL | 19.01.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2012010620 (UNIV SAVOIE [FR], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [X]CN204255152U (ZHONGKE SUPAI ENERGY TECHNOLOGY JINGJIANG CO LTD) [X] 1-15 * figure - *; | [X]WO2015067462 (EATON ELECTRICAL IP GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1-15 * figure - * |