EP3429284 - METHOD FOR DETERMINING A DELAY TIME BETWEEN TWO WIRELESS COMMUNICATION ENTITIES, TIME STAMP DEVICE AS WELL AS SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.07.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rohde & Schwarz GmbH & Co. KG Mühldorfstrasse 15 81671 München / DE | [2019/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kehlenbach, Werner Gebrüder-Wandinger-Weg 2 84405 Dorfen / DE | 02 /
Eichler, Taro Menzinger Straße 35 80638 München / DE | [2019/03] | Representative(s) | Prinz & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | [2019/03] | Application number, filing date | 17181144.1 | 13.07.2017 | [2019/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3429284 | Date: | 16.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3429284 | Date: | 23.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04W56/00 | [2019/03] | CPC: |
H04W56/0065 (EP);
H04W56/0015 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/30] |
Former [2019/33] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | ||
Former [2019/03] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG EINER VERZÖGERUNGSZEIT ZWISCHEN ZWEI DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSEINHEITEN, ZEITSTEMPELVORRICHTUNG SOWIE SYSTEM | [2019/03] | English: | METHOD FOR DETERMINING A DELAY TIME BETWEEN TWO WIRELESS COMMUNICATION ENTITIES, TIME STAMP DEVICE AS WELL AS SYSTEM | [2019/03] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR DÉTERMINER UN DURÉE DE RETARD ENTRE DEUX ENTITÉS DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL, DISPOSITIF D'ESTAMPILLE TEMPORELLE AINSI QUE SYSTÈME | [2019/03] | Examination procedure | 03.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.07.2019 | Examination requested [2019/33] | 03.07.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.03.2023 | 16.03.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 20.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 21.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.08.2023 | CZ | 23.08.2023 | DK | 23.08.2023 | EE | 23.08.2023 | ES | 23.08.2023 | FI | 23.08.2023 | HR | 23.08.2023 | IT | 23.08.2023 | LT | 23.08.2023 | LV | 23.08.2023 | NL | 23.08.2023 | PL | 23.08.2023 | RO | 23.08.2023 | RS | 23.08.2023 | SE | 23.08.2023 | SI | 23.08.2023 | SK | 23.08.2023 | SM | 23.08.2023 | NO | 23.11.2023 | GR | 24.11.2023 | IS | 23.12.2023 | PT | 26.12.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
CZ | 23.08.2023 | ||
DK | 23.08.2023 | ||
EE | 23.08.2023 | ||
ES | 23.08.2023 | ||
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
IT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RO | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
SK | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
CZ | 23.08.2023 | ||
DK | 23.08.2023 | ||
EE | 23.08.2023 | ||
ES | 23.08.2023 | ||
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RO | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
SK | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
CZ | 23.08.2023 | ||
DK | 23.08.2023 | ||
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RO | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
SM | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
HR | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
LV | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
PL | 23.08.2023 | ||
RS | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
PT | 26.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 23.08.2023 | |
FI | 23.08.2023 | ||
LT | 23.08.2023 | ||
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
SE | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | ||
IS | 23.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 23.08.2023 | |
NL | 23.08.2023 | ||
NO | 23.11.2023 | ||
GR | 24.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0101613 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 4, lines 3-26 * * page 6, line 23 - page 7, line 22 * * figure - * * the whole document *; | [X]US2008247352 (MARTIN BEATRICE [FR]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraphs [0016] - [0017] * * paragraph [0043] * * paragraphs [0050] - [0052] * * figure - * * claim - *; | [X]US2011216660 (LEE JUNG GUN [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0010] - [0015] * * paragraph [0022] * * figure 1 *; | [A] - YONGHWAN BANG ET AL, "Wireless network synchronization for multichannel multimedia services", ADVANCED COMMUNICATION TECHNOLOGY, 2009. ICACT 2009. 11TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, GIRI, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20090215), ISBN 978-89-5519-138-7, pages 1073 - 1077, XP031445859 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * |