Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2017233464 | Global Dossier | 17.08.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US82793306 | 03.10.2006 | US201615362392 | 28.11.2016 | US201314139332 | 23.12.2013 | WO2007US21234 | 03.10.2007 | US44405909 | 09.06.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014199399 | Global Dossier | 17.07.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US82793306 | 03.10.2006 | US201314139332 | 23.12.2013 | WO2007US21234 | 03.10.2007 | US44405909 | 09.06.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8642034 | Global Dossier | 04.02.2014 | B2 | US2010008911 | 14.01.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US44405907 | 03.10.2007 | US82793306 | 03.10.2006 | WO2007US21234 | 03.10.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL251994 | Global Dossier | 31.01.2021 | B | Priority number | Date | US82793306 | 03.10.2006 | WO2007US21234 | 03.10.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2918288 | Global Dossier | 16.08.2017 | B1 | EP2918288 | 16.09.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US82793306 | 03.10.2006 | EP07867199 | 03.10.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2083863 | Global Dossier | 18.03.2015 | B1 | EP2083863 | 05.08.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US82793306 | 03.10.2006 | WO2007US21234 | 03.10.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3254696 | Global Dossier | 13.12.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US82793306 | 03.10.2006 | EP07867199 | 03.10.2007 | EP15154393 | 03.10.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2083863T | 22.06.2015 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US82793306 | 03.10.2006 | WO2007US21234 | 03.10.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2918288T | 27.11.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US82793306 | 03.10.2006 | EP07867199 | 03.10.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2538265T | 18.06.2015 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US82793306 | 03.10.2006 | WO2007US21234 | 03.10.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL197797 | 29.05.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US82793306 | 03.10.2006 | WO2007US21234 | 03.10.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2009003518 | 25.08.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US82793306 | 03.10.2006 | WO2007US21234 | 03.10.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2083863T | 31.08.2015 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US82793306 | 03.10.2006 | EP07867199 | 03.10.2007 | WO2007US21234 | 03.10.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2918288T | 28.02.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US82793306 | 03.10.2006 | EP07867199 | 03.10.2007 | EP15154393 | 03.10.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008060371 | Global Dossier | 10.07.2008 | A8 | WO2008060371 | 22.05.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US82793306 | 03.10.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101553254 | 07.10.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US82793306 | 03.10.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104645328 | 27.05.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US82793306 | 03.10.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2647472T | 21.12.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US82793306 | 03.10.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE035575T | 28.05.2018 | T2 | Priority number | Date | US82793306 | 03.10.2006 | Type | Earlier application | EP2083863 | EP2918288 |