blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3270600

EP3270600 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR SUPPLEMENTAL CONTENT SELECTION AND DELIVERY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  31.07.2020
Database last updated on 05.05.2025
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  20.07.2018
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  15.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.03.2025New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Comcast Cable Communications LLC
1701 John F. Kennedy Blvd.
Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19103 / US
[2018/03]
Inventor(s)01 / Dalrymple, Michael
c/o Comcast Cable Communications, LLC
1701 John F. Kennedy Boulevard
Philadelphia, PA Pennsylvania 19103 / US
02 / Vella, Zane
c/o Comcast Cable Communications, LLC
1701 John F. Kennedy Boulevard
Philadelphia, PA Pennsylvania 19103 / US
03 / Goudey, Ken
c/o Comcast Cable Communications, LLC
1701 John F. Kennedy Boulevard
Philadelphia, PA Pennsylvania 19103 / US
 [2018/03]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
Carnegieplein 5
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[2018/03]
Application number, filing date17181362.914.07.2017
[2018/03]
Priority number, dateUS201662362587P14.07.2016         Original published format: US 201662362587 P
US201662366540P25.07.2016         Original published format: US 201662366540 P
US20161533181222.10.2016         Original published format: US201615331812
[2018/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3270600
Date:17.01.2018
Language:EN
[2018/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.10.2017
ClassificationIPC:H04N21/81, H04N21/4725
[2018/03]
CPC:
H04N21/812 (EP); H04N21/4725 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/34]
Former [2018/03]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR ZUSÄTZLICHEN SAMMLUNG, BEARBEITUNG UND VERTEILUNG VON INHALTEN[2018/03]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR SUPPLEMENTAL CONTENT SELECTION AND DELIVERY[2018/03]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE SÉLECTION ET DE LIVRAISON DE CONTENU SUPPLÉMENTAIRE[2018/03]
Examination procedure14.07.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
13.07.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.07.2018Examination requested  [2018/34]
04.08.2020Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.02.2021Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.02.2022Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.08.2022Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.11.2024Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 22.11.2024
22.11.2024Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
24.03.2025Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
27.07.2020Renewal fee patent year 04
27.07.2021Renewal fee patent year 05
27.07.2022Renewal fee patent year 06
27.07.2023Renewal fee patent year 07
29.07.2024Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2013014155  (CLARKE DOUGLAS [US], et al);
 [A]US2014337127  (MOREL DAVID [US], et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.