Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10815004 | Global Dossier | 27.10.2020 | B2 | US2019016473 | 17.01.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP17181561 | 14.07.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3428072 | Global Dossier | 25.03.2020 | B1 | EP3428072 | 16.01.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP17181561 | 14.07.2017 |