EP3273691 - IMAGE PROCESSING DEVICE AND IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.07.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.08.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.04.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.05.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Group Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2021/30] |
Former [2018/04] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SATO, Kazushi c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2018/04] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/04] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 17181919.6 | 21.11.2013 | [2018/04] | Priority number, date | JP20120275775 | 18.12.2012 Original published format: JP 2012275775 | JP20130144930 | 10.07.2013 Original published format: JP 2013144930 | [2018/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3273691 | Date: | 24.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3273691 | Date: | 22.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/124, H04N19/186, H04N19/187, H04N19/196, H04N19/33, H04N19/46 | [2018/04] | CPC: |
H04N19/124 (EP,KR,RU,US);
H04N19/30 (KR,RU);
H04N19/34 (US);
G06T9/00 (RU);
H04N19/117 (KR);
H04N19/147 (US);
H04N19/18 (RU,US);
H04N19/186 (EP,KR,RU,US);
H04N19/187 (EP,RU,US);
H04N19/196 (EP,RU,US);
H04N19/33 (EP,US);
H04N19/46 (EP,RU,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/04] | Title | German: | BILDVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND BILDVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN | [2018/04] | English: | IMAGE PROCESSING DEVICE AND IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD | [2018/04] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGES ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGES | [2018/04] | Examination procedure | 18.07.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.08.2017 | Examination requested [2018/04] | 22.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.08.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13863956.2 / EP2908526 | Opposition(s) | 23.06.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.11.2013 | AL | 22.09.2021 | AT | 22.09.2021 | CY | 22.09.2021 | CZ | 22.09.2021 | DK | 22.09.2021 | EE | 22.09.2021 | ES | 22.09.2021 | FI | 22.09.2021 | HR | 22.09.2021 | IT | 22.09.2021 | LT | 22.09.2021 | LV | 22.09.2021 | MC | 22.09.2021 | MK | 22.09.2021 | MT | 22.09.2021 | NL | 22.09.2021 | PL | 22.09.2021 | RO | 22.09.2021 | RS | 22.09.2021 | SE | 22.09.2021 | SI | 22.09.2021 | SK | 22.09.2021 | SM | 22.09.2021 | TR | 22.09.2021 | IE | 21.11.2021 | LU | 21.11.2021 | BE | 30.11.2021 | BG | 22.12.2021 | NO | 22.12.2021 | GR | 23.12.2021 | IS | 22.01.2022 | PT | 24.01.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 21.11.2013 | |
AL | 22.09.2021 | ||
AT | 22.09.2021 | ||
CY | 22.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
DK | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
ES | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
IT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
MC | 22.09.2021 | ||
MK | 22.09.2021 | ||
NL | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RO | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
SI | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
SM | 22.09.2021 | ||
TR | 22.09.2021 | ||
IE | 21.11.2021 | ||
LU | 21.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
IS | 22.01.2022 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 21.11.2013 | |
AL | 22.09.2021 | ||
AT | 22.09.2021 | ||
CY | 22.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
DK | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
ES | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
IT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
MC | 22.09.2021 | ||
MK | 22.09.2021 | ||
NL | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RO | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
SI | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
SM | 22.09.2021 | ||
IE | 21.11.2021 | ||
LU | 21.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
IS | 22.01.2022 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 21.11.2013 | |
AL | 22.09.2021 | ||
AT | 22.09.2021 | ||
CY | 22.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
DK | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
ES | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
IT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
MC | 22.09.2021 | ||
NL | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RO | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
SI | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
SM | 22.09.2021 | ||
IE | 21.11.2021 | ||
LU | 21.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
IS | 22.01.2022 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 21.11.2013 | |
AL | 22.09.2021 | ||
AT | 22.09.2021 | ||
CY | 22.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
DK | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
ES | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
IT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
MC | 22.09.2021 | ||
NL | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RO | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
SI | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
IE | 21.11.2021 | ||
LU | 21.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
IS | 22.01.2022 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 21.11.2013 | |
AL | 22.09.2021 | ||
AT | 22.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
DK | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
ES | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
IT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
MC | 22.09.2021 | ||
NL | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RO | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
SI | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
IE | 21.11.2021 | ||
LU | 21.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
IS | 22.01.2022 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 22.09.2021 | |
AT | 22.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
DK | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
ES | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
IT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
MC | 22.09.2021 | ||
NL | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RO | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
SI | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
IE | 21.11.2021 | ||
LU | 21.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
IS | 22.01.2022 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 22.09.2021 | |
AT | 22.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
DK | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
ES | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
MC | 22.09.2021 | ||
NL | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RO | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
SI | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
IE | 21.11.2021 | ||
LU | 21.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
IS | 22.01.2022 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AL | 22.09.2021 | |
AT | 22.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
DK | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
ES | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
MC | 22.09.2021 | ||
NL | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RO | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
IE | 21.11.2021 | ||
LU | 21.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
IS | 22.01.2022 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 22.09.2021 | |
AT | 22.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
DK | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
ES | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
MC | 22.09.2021 | ||
NL | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RO | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
LU | 21.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
IS | 22.01.2022 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 22.09.2021 | |
AT | 22.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
ES | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
MC | 22.09.2021 | ||
NL | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RO | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
LU | 21.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
IS | 22.01.2022 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 22.09.2021 | |
AT | 22.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
ES | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
MC | 22.09.2021 | ||
NL | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RO | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
IS | 22.01.2022 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 22.09.2021 | |
AT | 22.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
ES | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
NL | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RO | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
IS | 22.01.2022 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 22.09.2021 | |
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
ES | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
NL | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RO | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
IS | 22.01.2022 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 22.09.2021 | |
CZ | 22.09.2021 | ||
EE | 22.09.2021 | ||
ES | 22.09.2021 | ||
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
PL | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
SK | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
PT | 24.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 22.09.2021 | |
FI | 22.09.2021 | ||
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | FI | 22.09.2021 | |
HR | 22.09.2021 | ||
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
LV | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
GR | 23.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | FI | 22.09.2021 | |
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
RS | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | FI | 22.09.2021 | |
LT | 22.09.2021 | ||
SE | 22.09.2021 | ||
BG | 22.12.2021 | ||
NO | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | LT | 22.09.2021 | |
NO | 22.12.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2003058936 (PENG WEN-HSIAO [US], et al); | [X]EP2068567 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [X]WO2012160890 (SONY CORP [JP], et al); | US2014050267 [ ] (SAKURAI HIRONARI [JP], et al); |