EP3293066 - VEHICLE CONTROL APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.02.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.10.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [2018/18] |
Former [2018/11] | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-Ken 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ITO, Hironori c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | 02 /
NAGAE, Akira c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | 03 /
INOMATA, Ryo c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | 04 /
IKEDA, Masayuki c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [2019/15] |
Former [2019/14] | 01 /
ITO, Hironori c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | ||
02 /
NAGAE, Akira c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | |||
03 /
INOMATA, Ryo c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | |||
04 /
IKEDA, Masayuki c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | |||
Former [2019/13] | 01 /
ITO, Hironori c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | ||
02 /
NAGAE, Akira c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | |||
03 /
INOMATA, Ryo c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | |||
04 /
IKEDA, Masayuki c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | |||
Former [2018/11] | 01 /
ITO, Hironori c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | ||
02 /
NAGAE, Akira c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | |||
03 /
INOMATA, Ryo c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | |||
04 /
IKEDA, Masayuki c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [2019/13] |
Former [2018/11] | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 17181930.3 | 18.07.2017 | [2018/11] | Priority number, date | JP20160177626 | 12.09.2016 Original published format: JP 2016177626 | [2018/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3293066 | Date: | 14.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/11] | Type: | A8 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP3293066 | Date: | 12.09.2018 | [2018/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3293066 | Date: | 27.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B60T8/1755 | [2018/11] | CPC: |
B60T8/17555 (EP,US);
B60W10/188 (CN,RU);
B60T8/26 (KR);
B60W30/12 (CN);
B60W10/184 (US);
B60T13/167 (KR);
B60T13/686 (KR);
B60T13/745 (KR);
B60T8/17557 (EP,US);
B60T8/363 (KR);
B60W10/20 (CN);
B60W30/025 (CN,US);
B60W30/10 (RU);
B60T2201/083 (EP,US);
B60W2520/06 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/11] | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGSTEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2018/11] | English: | VEHICLE CONTROL APPARATUS | [2018/11] | French: | APPAREIL DE CONTRÔLE DE VÉHICULE | [2018/11] | Examination procedure | 18.07.2017 | Examination requested [2018/11] | 18.07.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.02.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/11] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.07.2017 | AL | 27.03.2019 | AT | 27.03.2019 | CY | 27.03.2019 | CZ | 27.03.2019 | DK | 27.03.2019 | EE | 27.03.2019 | ES | 27.03.2019 | FI | 27.03.2019 | HR | 27.03.2019 | IT | 27.03.2019 | LT | 27.03.2019 | LV | 27.03.2019 | MC | 27.03.2019 | MK | 27.03.2019 | MT | 27.03.2019 | NL | 27.03.2019 | PL | 27.03.2019 | RO | 27.03.2019 | RS | 27.03.2019 | SE | 27.03.2019 | SI | 27.03.2019 | SK | 27.03.2019 | SM | 27.03.2019 | TR | 27.03.2019 | BG | 27.06.2019 | NO | 27.06.2019 | GR | 28.06.2019 | IE | 18.07.2019 | LU | 18.07.2019 | IS | 27.07.2019 | PT | 27.07.2019 | BE | 31.07.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 18.07.2017 | |
AL | 27.03.2019 | ||
AT | 27.03.2019 | ||
CY | 27.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
DK | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
MC | 27.03.2019 | ||
MT | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
TR | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IE | 18.07.2019 | ||
LU | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 18.07.2017 | |
AL | 27.03.2019 | ||
AT | 27.03.2019 | ||
CY | 27.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
DK | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
MC | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
TR | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IE | 18.07.2019 | ||
LU | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
AT | 27.03.2019 | ||
CY | 27.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
DK | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
MC | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
TR | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IE | 18.07.2019 | ||
LU | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
AT | 27.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
DK | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
MC | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
TR | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IE | 18.07.2019 | ||
LU | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
AT | 27.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
DK | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
MC | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
TR | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
LU | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
AT | 27.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
DK | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
MC | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
TR | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
AT | 27.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
DK | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
MC | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
AT | 27.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
DK | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SI | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
AT | 27.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
DK | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
AT | 27.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
IS | 27.07.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
AT | 27.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
PL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
SM | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 27.03.2019 | |
CZ | 27.03.2019 | ||
EE | 27.03.2019 | ||
ES | 27.03.2019 | ||
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RO | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
SK | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 27.03.2019 | |
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
PT | 27.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 27.03.2019 | |
FI | 27.03.2019 | ||
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | FI | 27.03.2019 | |
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 27.03.2019 | |
HR | 27.03.2019 | ||
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
LV | 27.03.2019 | ||
NL | 27.03.2019 | ||
RS | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 27.03.2019 | |
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
BG | 27.06.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 27.03.2019 | |
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
GR | 28.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 27.03.2019 | |
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
SE | 27.03.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 27.03.2019 | |
LT | 27.03.2019 | ||
NO | 27.06.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004158377 (MATSUMOTO SHINJI [JP], et al); | [A]EP1588911 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]); | [A]US2011130923 (WATANABE RYOCHI [JP]); | [A]US2013253793 (LEE JIN-WOO [US], et al) | by applicant | JP2006282168 |