EP3301118 - SULPHUR-LINKABLE RUBBER COMPOUND, VULCANIZATE OF THE RUBBER COMPOUND AND VEHICLE TYRES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.06.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.04.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.03.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.12.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.10.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Reifen Deutschland GmbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | [2018/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Müller, Norbert Willi-Lochte-Weg 7 29336 Nienhagen / DE | 02 /
Pavon Sierra, Viktoria Cordweg 12 30419 Hannover / DE | [2018/14] | Representative(s) | Finger, Karsten Continental Aktiengesellschaft Patente und Lizenzen Postfach 169 30001 Hannover / DE | [2018/14] | Application number, filing date | 17182028.5 | 19.07.2017 | [2018/14] | Priority number, date | DE201610218870 | 29.09.2016 Original published format: DE102016218870 | [2018/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3301118 | Date: | 04.04.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3301118 | Date: | 10.07.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C08C19/25, B60C1/00, C08K3/36, C08L7/00, C08L9/00, C08L9/06 | [2018/14] | CPC: |
C08L9/00 (EP);
B29B7/7495 (EP);
B60C1/0016 (EP);
C08C19/25 (EP);
C08L9/06 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08L9/00, C08K3/36, C08L23/18 (EP);
C08L9/06, C08L9/00, C08L15/00, C08L7/00, C08K3/36, C08K5/548 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/46] |
Former [2018/14] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SCHWEFELVERNETZBARE KAUTSCHUKMISCHUNG, VULKANISAT DER KAUTSCHUKMISCHUNG UND FAHRZEUGREIFEN | [2018/14] | English: | SULPHUR-LINKABLE RUBBER COMPOUND, VULCANIZATE OF THE RUBBER COMPOUND AND VEHICLE TYRES | [2018/14] | French: | MÉLANGE DE CAOUTCHOUC RÉTICULABLE AU SOUFRE, VULCANISATION DE MÉLANGE DE CAOUTCHOUC ET PNEUMATIQUE POUR VÉHICULE | [2018/14] | Examination procedure | 04.10.2018 | Examination requested [2018/46] | 04.10.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.12.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 04.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.05.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.07.2017 | AL | 10.07.2019 | CY | 10.07.2019 | CZ | 10.07.2019 | DK | 10.07.2019 | EE | 10.07.2019 | FI | 10.07.2019 | HR | 10.07.2019 | IT | 10.07.2019 | LT | 10.07.2019 | LV | 10.07.2019 | MC | 10.07.2019 | MK | 10.07.2019 | MT | 10.07.2019 | NL | 10.07.2019 | PL | 10.07.2019 | RO | 10.07.2019 | RS | 10.07.2019 | SE | 10.07.2019 | SI | 10.07.2019 | SK | 10.07.2019 | SM | 10.07.2019 | TR | 10.07.2019 | IE | 19.07.2019 | LU | 19.07.2019 | BE | 31.07.2019 | BG | 10.10.2019 | NO | 10.10.2019 | GR | 11.10.2019 | IS | 10.11.2019 | PT | 11.11.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 19.07.2017 | |
AL | 10.07.2019 | ||
CY | 10.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
IT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
MC | 10.07.2019 | ||
MT | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
SI | 10.07.2019 | ||
SK | 10.07.2019 | ||
SM | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
IE | 19.07.2019 | ||
LU | 19.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 19.07.2017 | |
AL | 10.07.2019 | ||
CY | 10.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
IT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
MC | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
SI | 10.07.2019 | ||
SK | 10.07.2019 | ||
SM | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
IE | 19.07.2019 | ||
LU | 19.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 10.07.2019 | |
CY | 10.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
IT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
MC | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
SI | 10.07.2019 | ||
SK | 10.07.2019 | ||
SM | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
IE | 19.07.2019 | ||
LU | 19.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 10.07.2019 | |
CZ | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
IT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
MC | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
SI | 10.07.2019 | ||
SK | 10.07.2019 | ||
SM | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
IE | 19.07.2019 | ||
LU | 19.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 10.07.2019 | |
CZ | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
IT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
MC | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
SK | 10.07.2019 | ||
SM | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
IE | 19.07.2019 | ||
LU | 19.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 10.07.2019 | |
CZ | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
IT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
MC | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
SK | 10.07.2019 | ||
SM | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
LU | 19.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 10.07.2019 | |
CZ | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
IT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
MC | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
SK | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
LU | 19.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 10.07.2019 | |
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
IT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
MC | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 10.07.2019 | |
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
IT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 10.07.2019 | |
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 10.07.2019 | |
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 10.07.2019 | |
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | FI | 10.07.2019 | |
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 10.07.2019 | |
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 10.07.2019 | |
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 10.07.2019 | |
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | NL | 10.07.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4218349 (MINATONO SHOBU [JP], et al) [A] 1-14* the whole document *; | [A]EP1925636 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0062] , [0087] , [0091] , [0107] , [0108]; tables 1-7 *; | [A]EP2065221 (CONTINENTAL AG [DE]) [A] 1-14 * tables 1,2 *; | [A]US2009239974 (MORI NORIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * tables 1,2 *; | [A]WO2012084360 (CONTINENTAL REIFEN DEUTSCHLAND [DE], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2743301 (CONTINENTAL REIFEN DEUTSCHLAND [DE]) [A] 1-14 * examples 1-3; table 1 *; | [A]EP2778184 (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]) [A] 1-14 * tables 1-4 *; | [A]EP2987813 (CONTINENTAL REIFEN DEUTSCHLAND [DE]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0065]; examples V2,V3,E1; claims 1-6; table 1 * | by applicant | DE3804908 | WO9909036 | EP1035164 | EP1052270 | US2002082333 | WO2008083241 | WO2008083242 | WO2008083243 | WO2008083244 | DE102008058996 | DE102008058991 | WO2010049216 | EP2060604 | EP2589619 |