13.09.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] |
14.06.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] |
27.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] |
12.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] |
29.03.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] |
14.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] |
02.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.07.2023 [2023/27] |
21.04.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.05.2023 [2023/21] |
10.02.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.03.2023 [2023/11] |
02.12.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.01.2023 [2023/01] |
04.11.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.12.2022 [2022/49] |
21.10.2022 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 23.11.2022 [2022/47] |
14.10.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.11.2022 [2022/46] |
16.09.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.10.2022 [2022/42] |
12.08.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.09.2022 [2022/37] |
05.08.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2022 [2022/36] |
29.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.08.2022 [2022/35] |
22.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.08.2022 [2022/34] |
15.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] |
27.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] |
20.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.06.2022 [2022/25] |
13.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.06.2022 [2022/24] |
29.04.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.06.2022 [2022/22] |
22.04.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.05.2022 [2022/21] |
15.04.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.05.2022 [2022/20] |
18.02.2022 |
Change - applicant |
published on 23.03.2022 [2022/12] |
12.11.2021 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 15.12.2021 [2021/50] |
05.11.2021 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
25.08.2021 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
18.08.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
18.08.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
30.07.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.06.2021 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
09.03.2021 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
29.01.2021 |
Change - classification |
published on 03.03.2021 [2021/09] |
29.01.2021 |
Change - classification |
published on 03.03.2021 [2021/09] |
14.12.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
28.10.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
25.07.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.03.2020 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
28.02.2020 |
New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
28.02.2020 |
Deletion: Date of oral proceedings |
|
28.02.2020 |
Deletion: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
07.10.2019 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
29.07.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.07.2019 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
29.05.2019 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
08.02.2019 |
First examination report |
|
02.02.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
20.07.2018 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
20.07.2018 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] |
20.07.2018 |
Change - designated states |
published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] |
20.07.2018 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
28.12.2017 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 24.01.2018 [2018/04] |
19.07.2017 |
Change - representative |
|