EP3272788 - RESIN POWDER FOR SOLID FREEFORM FABRICATION, DEVICE FOR SOLID FREEFORM FABRICATION OBJECT, AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING SOLID FREEFORM FABRICATION OBJECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 20.01.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.06.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.2023 | Revocation of patent | published on 22.02.2023 [2023/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2018/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAITO, Akira c/o Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 02 /
YAMASHITA, Yasuyuki c/o Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 03 /
KAMODA, Kiichi c/o Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 04 /
YAGUCHI, Shigenori c/o Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 05 /
TAMOTO, Nozomu c/o Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 06 /
IWATSUKI, Hitoshi c/o Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 07 /
HIGUCHI, Shinzo c/o Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 08 /
IIDA, Sohichiroh c/o Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | 09 /
SUZUKI, Yasuo c/o Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6 Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2018/04] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/04] | White, Duncan Rohan Marks & Clerk LLP Fletcher House (2nd Floor) Heatley Road The Oxford Science Park Oxford OX4 4GE / GB | Application number, filing date | 17182489.9 | 21.07.2017 | [2018/04] | Priority number, date | JP20160144862 | 22.07.2016 Original published format: JP 2016144862 | JP20170049036 | 14.03.2017 Original published format: JP 2017049036 | JP20170111488 | 06.06.2017 Original published format: JP 2017111488 | JP20170138268 | 14.07.2017 Original published format: JP 2017138268 | [2018/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3272788 | Date: | 24.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3272788 | Date: | 08.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C08J3/12 | [2018/04] | CPC: |
B29C64/153 (EP,US);
C08L67/02 (CN);
B29B9/12 (EP);
B29B9/16 (EP);
B33Y10/00 (CN,US);
B33Y70/00 (US);
B33Y70/10 (EP,CN,US);
C08F110/06 (US);
C08G63/183 (US);
C08G67/00 (US);
C08G69/26 (US);
C08G8/02 (US);
C08J3/12 (EP,US);
C08K3/016 (EP,US);
C08K3/08 (CN);
C08K5/0066 (US);
C08K7/06 (CN);
C08K7/14 (CN);
C08K7/18 (CN);
C08L23/12 (CN);
C08L59/00 (CN);
C08L61/16 (CN);
C08L77/06 (CN);
B29B2009/125 (EP);
B29K2101/12 (US);
B29K2105/251 (US);
B29K2995/0041 (US);
C08J2361/00 (EP,US);
C08J2361/16 (EP,US);
C08J2367/02 (EP,US);
C08J2367/04 (EP,US);
C08J2377/02 (EP,US);
C08J2377/08 (EP,US);
C08J2377/10 (EP,US);
C08K2003/0812 (CN);
C08L2201/02 (CN);
Y02P10/25 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08K3/08, C08L67/02 (CN);
C08K7/06, C08L67/02 (CN);
C08K7/14, C08L67/02 (CN);
C08K7/18, C08L67/02 (CN) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/04] | Title | German: | HARZPULVER ZUR FERTIGUNG VON FESTEN FREIFORMEN, VORRICHTUNG ZUR FERTIGUNG VON FESTEN FREIFORMOBJEKTEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR FERTIGUNG VON FESTEN FREIFORMOBJEKTEN | [2018/04] | English: | RESIN POWDER FOR SOLID FREEFORM FABRICATION, DEVICE FOR SOLID FREEFORM FABRICATION OBJECT, AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING SOLID FREEFORM FABRICATION OBJECT | [2018/04] | French: | POUDRE DE RÉSINE POUR LA FABRICATION DE FORME LIBRE SOLIDE, DISPOSITIF POUR UN OBJET DE FABRICATION DE FORME LIBRE SOLIDE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN OBJET DE FABRICATION DE FORME LIBRE SOLIDE | [2018/04] | Examination procedure | 21.07.2017 | Examination requested [2018/04] | 21.07.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.05.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP20177083.1 / EP3750943 | EP22168529.0 / EP4056628 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
08.04.2021
14.04.2021
ADMISSIBLE Evonik Operations GmbH Rellinghauser Straße 1-11 45128 Essen / DE Opponent's representative f & e patent Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | 02
08.04.2021
14.04.2021
ADMISSIBLE ARKEMA FRANCE 420, Rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92700 Colombes / FR Opponent's representative Bandpay & Greuter 11 rue Christophe Colomb 75008 Paris / FR | 03
08.04.2021
14.04.2021
ADMISSIBLE EOS GmbH Electro Optical Systems Robert-Stirling-Ring 1 82152 Krailling / DE Opponent's representative Pfrang, Tilman Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 860624 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/20] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.04.2021
14.04.2021
ADMISSIBLE Evonik Operations GmbH Rellinghauser Straße 1-11 45128 Essen / DE Opponent's representative f & e patent Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | ||
02
08.04.2021
14.04.2021
ADMISSIBLE ARKEMA FRANCE 420, Rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92700 Colombes / FR Opponent's representative Bandpay & Greuter 30, rue Notre-Dame des Victoires 75002 Paris / FR | |||
03
08.04.2021
14.04.2021
ADMISSIBLE EOS GmbH Electro Optical Systems Robert-Stirling-Ring 1 82152 Krailling / DE Opponent's representative Pfrang, Tilman Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 860624 81633 München / DE | |||
Former [2021/19] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.04.2021
Evonik Operations GmbH Rellinghauser Straße 1-11 45128 Essen / DE Opponent's representative f & e patent Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | 20.04.2021 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 27.08.2021 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 22.09.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.09.2022 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2023/08] | 30.09.2022 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 30.09.2022 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.07.2017 | AL | 08.07.2020 | AT | 08.07.2020 | CY | 08.07.2020 | CZ | 08.07.2020 | DK | 08.07.2020 | EE | 08.07.2020 | ES | 08.07.2020 | FI | 08.07.2020 | HR | 08.07.2020 | LT | 08.07.2020 | LV | 08.07.2020 | MC | 08.07.2020 | MK | 08.07.2020 | MT | 08.07.2020 | NL | 08.07.2020 | PL | 08.07.2020 | RO | 08.07.2020 | RS | 08.07.2020 | SE | 08.07.2020 | SI | 08.07.2020 | SK | 08.07.2020 | SM | 08.07.2020 | TR | 08.07.2020 | IE | 21.07.2020 | LU | 21.07.2020 | CH | 31.07.2020 | LI | 31.07.2020 | BG | 08.10.2020 | NO | 08.10.2020 | GR | 09.10.2020 | IS | 08.11.2020 | PT | 09.11.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 21.07.2017 | |
AL | 08.07.2020 | ||
AT | 08.07.2020 | ||
CY | 08.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
MC | 08.07.2020 | ||
MT | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SI | 08.07.2020 | ||
SK | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
TR | 08.07.2020 | ||
IE | 21.07.2020 | ||
LU | 21.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 21.07.2017 | |
AL | 08.07.2020 | ||
AT | 08.07.2020 | ||
CY | 08.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
MT | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SI | 08.07.2020 | ||
SK | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
TR | 08.07.2020 | ||
IE | 21.07.2020 | ||
LU | 21.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 08.07.2020 | |
AT | 08.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SI | 08.07.2020 | ||
SK | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
IE | 21.07.2020 | ||
LU | 21.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 08.07.2020 | |
AT | 08.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SI | 08.07.2020 | ||
SK | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
LU | 21.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 08.07.2020 | |
AT | 08.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SK | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
LU | 21.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 08.07.2020 | |
AT | 08.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
LU | 21.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 08.07.2020 | |
CZ | 08.07.2020 | ||
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
EE | 08.07.2020 | ||
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RO | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
SM | 08.07.2020 | ||
LU | 21.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 08.07.2020 | |
DK | 08.07.2020 | ||
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
LU | 21.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/17] | AT | 08.07.2020 | |
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
NL | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 08.07.2020 | |
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
HR | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
LV | 08.07.2020 | ||
PL | 08.07.2020 | ||
RS | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
IS | 08.11.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 08.07.2020 | |
ES | 08.07.2020 | ||
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
GR | 09.10.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | ES | 08.07.2020 | |
FI | 08.07.2020 | ||
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
SE | 08.07.2020 | ||
BG | 08.10.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | ||
PT | 09.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 08.07.2020 | |
LT | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.10.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5342919 (DICKENS JR ELMER D [US], et al); | [A]EP2177557 (TECHNO POLYMER CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]WO2015109143 (LUBRIZOL ADVANCED MAT INC [US]) | by applicant | US6531086 | WO2008057844 | Opposition | WO2009135521 | EP2177557 | US7794647 | WO2013090174 | WO2013138204 | US2016038633 | WO2016101942 | EP3272788 | JPS642810B | EP1413595 | US2008166496 | US2008258330 | US2009236775 | US2013323416 | EP2985269 | WO2016104140 | JP2016144862 | JP2017043654 | JP2017049036 | JP2017111488 | JP2017138268 | WO2008122426 | JP2015500375 | EP3239214 | EP3272787 | EP3750943 |