blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3431262

EP3431262 - PLANT FOR ADDITIVELY MANUFACTURING OF THREE-DIMENSIONAL OBJECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  29.07.2022
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  11.11.2021
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  17.06.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  05.04.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  21.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip29.07.2022Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 31.08.2022  [2022/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CL Schutzrechtsverwaltungs GmbH
An der Zeil 2
96215 Lichtenfels / DE
[2019/04]
Inventor(s)01 / Stammberger, Jens
Gnaileser Straße 55
96472 Rödental / DE
02 / Traut, Tanja
Weidacher Weg 5
96479 Weitramsdorf / DE
03 / Ullrich, Andreas
Eichenweg 14
96149 Breitengüßbach / DE
04 / Winiarski, Daniel
Peuntstraße 20
96231 Bad Staffelstein / DE
 [2019/04]
Representative(s)Hafner & Kohl PartmbB
Schleiermacherstraße 25
90491 Nürnberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2019/04]Hafner & Kohl
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Schleiermacherstraße 25
90491 Nürnberg / DE
Application number, filing date17182653.021.07.2017
[2019/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3431262
Date:23.01.2019
Language:EN
[2019/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.01.2018
ClassificationIPC:B33Y10/00, B33Y30/00, B29C64/282, B29C64/264, B29C64/277, B22F12/80
[2021/43]
CPC:
B22F10/28 (EP,CN,US); B33Y10/00 (EP,CN,US); B22F12/44 (EP,CN,US);
B22F12/45 (EP,CN,US); B22F12/80 (EP,CN,US); B28B1/001 (US);
B28B17/0081 (US); B29C64/153 (US); B29C64/20 (US);
B29C64/264 (EP,US); B29C64/277 (EP,US); B29C64/282 (EP,US);
B29C64/393 (US); B33Y30/00 (EP,CN,US); B33Y50/02 (US);
B22F10/36 (EP,CN,US); B22F12/41 (EP,CN,US); B22F12/49 (EP,CN,US);
Y02P10/25 (EP) (-)
Former IPC [2019/04]B29C64/282, B29C64/277, B29C64/264
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/19]
Former [2019/04]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ANLAGE ZUR GENERATIVEN FERTIGUNG VON DREIDIMENSIONALEN OBJEKTEN[2019/04]
English:PLANT FOR ADDITIVELY MANUFACTURING OF THREE-DIMENSIONAL OBJECTS[2019/04]
French:INSTALLATION DE FABRICATION ADDITIVE D'OBJETS TRIDIMENSIONNELS[2019/04]
Examination procedure29.03.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.03.2019Examination requested  [2019/19]
29.03.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
19.06.2020Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.10.2020Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.02.2021Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.05.2021Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.11.2021Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.03.2022Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2022/35]
12.04.2022Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2022/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
22.07.2020Renewal fee patent year 04
20.07.2021Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]DE19953000  (EXNER HORST [DE], et al) [Y] 6 * claim 1 *;
 [X]DE10235427  (EOS ELECTRO OPTICAL SYST [DE]) [X] 1,2,10,11 * figures 2, 3 ** paragraphs [0025] , [ 0026] *;
 [XY]WO2016184888  (ADDIFAB APS [DK]) [X] 1-5,7-11 * figure 2 * * page 4, lines 13, 20-22 * * page 5, lines 23-27 * * page 8, lines 8-14 * * page 10, lines 26-32 * [Y] 6
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.