EP3284857 - LAUNDRY DRYER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.09.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.12.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.08.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.10.2019 [2019/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2018/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dey, Uwe Kaiserin-Augusta-Allee 86C /29 10589 Berlin / DE | 02 /
Li, Maoyin No. 208 Yaoxin Road, Nanjing Xingang Economic and Technological Development Zone, 210046, Jiangsu P.R.China Nanjing, 211500 / CN | 03 /
Xu, Yonggang No. 208 Yaoxin road, Nanjing Nanjing, 210046 / CN | 04 /
You, Qixia No.208 Yao Xin Road Nanjing, 210048 / CN | 05 /
Zhang, Qi No. 208 yaoxin road, Nanjing, Xingang Nanjing, 210046 / CN | [2018/08] | Application number, filing date | 17182736.3 | 24.07.2017 | [2018/08] | Priority number, date | CN201610696466 | 19.08.2016 Original published format: CN201610696466 | [2018/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3284857 | Date: | 21.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | D06F58/02, D06F58/20, D06F25/00, D06F58/28 | [2018/08] | CPC: |
D06F58/20 (EP,CN,US);
D06F58/10 (CN);
D06F2103/36 (EP,US);
D06F2105/24 (EP,US);
D06F25/00 (EP,CN,US);
D06F58/02 (EP,CN,US);
D06F58/26 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/39] |
Former [2018/08] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄSCHETROCKNER | [2018/08] | English: | LAUNDRY DRYER | [2018/08] | French: | SÈCHE-LINGE | [2018/08] | Examination procedure | 24.07.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.08.2018 | Examination requested [2018/39] | 21.12.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/43] | 07.06.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/43] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2019 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE3135289 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-5 * page 4, line 11 - page 7, line 38; figures 1,2 * [Y] 5-7; | [Y]EP2843119 (ELECTROLUX APPLIANCES AB [SE]) [Y] 5,6 * paragraphs [0034] , [0035] , [0063]; figures 1,2,4 *; | [Y]US2011041260 (BALINSKI BARBARA A [US], et al) [Y] 5,6 * paragraph [0037]; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]EP1270793 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [Y] 7 * figures 2,3 *; | [Y]EP2886705 (DONGBU DAEWOO ELECTRONICS CORP [KR]) [Y] 7 * figure 5 *; | [A]GB2262595 (MERLONI ELETTRODOMESTICI SPA [IT]) [A] 1,5,6 * abstract *; | [A]EP0870859 (BALAY SA [ES]) [A] 1,4 * abstract * |