EP3258376 - SMART BRIDGE FOR MEMORY CORE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.03.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SanDisk Technologies LLC Two Legacy Town Center 6900 North Dallas Parkway Plano, Texas 75024 / US | [2017/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
D'ABREU, Manuel Antonio SanDisk Technologies LLC 951 Sandisk Drive Milpitas California 95035 / US | 02 /
SKALA, Stephen SanDisk Technologies LLC 951 Sandisk Drive Milpitas California 95035 / US | 03 /
PANTELAKIS, Dimitris SanDisk Technologies LLC 951 Sandisk Drive Milpitas California 95035 / US | 04 /
NAIR, Radhakrishnan SanDisk Technologies LLC 951 Sandisk Drive Milpitas California 95035 / US | 05 /
PANCHOLI, Deepak SanDisk Technologies LLC 951 Sandisk Drive Milpitas California 95035 / US | [2017/51] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/51] | Tothill, John Paul Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 17182847.8 | 21.06.2012 | [2017/51] | Priority number, date | US201161503531P | 30.06.2011 Original published format: US 201161503531 P | IN2011MUM2124 | 26.07.2011 Original published format: IN 2124MU2011 | US201113247532 | 28.09.2011 Original published format: US201113247532 | US201113247592 | 28.09.2011 Original published format: US201113247592 | US201113247635 | 28.09.2011 Original published format: US201113247635 | [2017/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3258376 | Date: | 20.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/10 | [2017/51] | CPC: |
G06F13/1668 (EP,US);
G06F11/10 (KR);
G11C5/02 (US);
G06F11/1048 (EP,US);
G06F11/1068 (EP,US);
G06F11/1072 (EP,US);
G06F12/00 (KR);
G11C14/0063 (EP,US);
G11C16/10 (EP,US);
G11C16/26 (EP,US);
G11C29/04 (EP,US);
G11C2029/0411 (EP,US);
Y02D10/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/15] |
Former [2017/51] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | INTELLIGENTE BRÜCKE FÜR SPEICHERKERN | [2017/51] | English: | SMART BRIDGE FOR MEMORY CORE | [2017/51] | French: | PONT INTELLIGENTE POUR NOYAU DE MÉMOIRE | [2017/51] | Examination procedure | 24.07.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/15] | 19.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/31] | 28.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/31] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12732924.1 / EP2726986 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2019 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2010023800 (HARARI ELIYAHOU [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * page 3, paragraphs 28-29 * * page 6, paragraphs 81-92 ** page 10, paragraph 129 - page 11, paragraph 135; figures 3A,3B,5A,5B,10A *; | [X]WO2011019600 (SANDISK CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * page 3, paragraph 21 - page 5, paragraph 25 * * page 9, paragraph 39 - page 10, paragraph 43 * * page 15, paragraph 59 - page 16, paragraph 60 * * page 17, paragraph 65 - page 21, paragraph 69 * * page 33, paragraph 101 - page 40, paragraph 118; figures 1,2A,3,4,5,6,7,13A * |