EP3435482 - CONNECTION PIECE WITH A CABLE ASSEMBLY AND A PLATE ASSEMBLY, METHOD FOR PRODUCING SUCH A CONNECTION PIECE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/05] | CONNECTION PIECE WITH A CABLE ASSEMBLY AND A PLATE ASSEMBLY, AND A PLATE ASSEMBLY FOR A CONNECTION PIECE, AND A METHOD FOR PRODUCING SUCH A CONNECTION PIECE | ||
[2019/10] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.03.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.04.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.02.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MD Elektronik GmbH Neutraublinger Strasse 4 84478 Waldkraiburg / DE | [2019/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Huber, Martin Laurentiusstr. 2 83119 Obing / DE | 02 /
Hofmann, Robert Pattenhamer Str. 13 83376 Truchtlaching / DE | 03 /
Trä, Johannes Nikolausstr. 6 84453-Mühldorf am Inn / DE | [2021/11] |
Former [2019/05] | 01 /
Huber, Martin Laurentiusstr. 2 83119 Obing / DE | ||
02 /
Hofmann, Robert Pattenhamer Str. 13 83376 Truchtlaching / DE | Representative(s) | Flach Bauer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Adlzreiterstraße 11 83022 Rosenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/05] | Flach Bauer Stahl Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Adlzreiterstraße 11 83022 Rosenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 17183028.4 | 25.07.2017 | [2019/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3435482 | Date: | 30.01.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3435482 | Date: | 15.05.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H01R4/02, H01R12/53, // H01R24/50 | [2019/05] | CPC: |
H01R12/53 (EP,US);
H01R4/029 (CN);
H01R12/523 (CN);
H01R4/02 (EP,US);
H01R43/0256 (US);
H05K1/183 (US);
H05K3/0044 (US);
H05K3/34 (US);
H01R12/7023 (EP,US);
H01R24/50 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09036 (US);
H05K2201/10356 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/14] |
Former [2019/05] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ANSCHLUSSVERBINDUNG MIT EINER KABELANORDNUNG UND EINER PLATTENANORDNUNG, SOWIE EIN VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINER SOLCHEN ANSCHLUSSVERBINDUNG | [2019/10] | English: | CONNECTION PIECE WITH A CABLE ASSEMBLY AND A PLATE ASSEMBLY, METHOD FOR PRODUCING SUCH A CONNECTION PIECE | [2019/10] | French: | LIAISON DE CONNEXION COMPRENANT UN SYSTÈME DE CÂBLE ET UN SYSTÈME DE PLAQUE, PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE TELLE LIAISON DE CONNEXION | [2019/10] |
Former [2019/05] | ANSCHLUSSVERBINDUNG MIT EINER KABELANORDNUNG UND EINER PLATTENANORDNUNG, SOWIE EINE PLATTENANORDNUNG FÜR EINE ANSCHLUSSVERBINDUNG, SOWIE EIN VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINER SOLCHEN ANSCHLUSSVERBINDUNG | ||
Former [2019/05] | CONNECTION PIECE WITH A CABLE ASSEMBLY AND A PLATE ASSEMBLY, AND A PLATE ASSEMBLY FOR A CONNECTION PIECE, AND A METHOD FOR PRODUCING SUCH A CONNECTION PIECE | ||
Former [2019/05] | LIAISON DE CONNEXION COMPRENANT UN SYSTÈME DE CÂBLE ET UN SYSTÈME DE PLAQUE, ET SYSTÈME DE PLAQUE POUR UNE LIAISON DE CONNEXION, PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE TELLE LIAISON DE CONNEXION | Examination procedure | 25.07.2017 | Examination requested [2019/05] | 18.01.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 04.04.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.04.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 18.02.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/17] | 18.02.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/11] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 15.05.2019 | CY | 15.05.2019 | CZ | 15.05.2019 | DK | 15.05.2019 | EE | 15.05.2019 | HR | 15.05.2019 | LV | 15.05.2019 | MC | 15.05.2019 | MK | 15.05.2019 | MT | 15.05.2019 | RO | 15.05.2019 | RS | 15.05.2019 | SI | 15.05.2019 | SK | 15.05.2019 | SM | 15.05.2019 | TR | 15.05.2019 | IE | 25.07.2019 | LU | 25.07.2019 | BE | 31.07.2019 | BG | 15.08.2019 | NO | 15.08.2019 | GR | 16.08.2019 | IS | 15.09.2019 | PT | 15.09.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/48] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
CY | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
MT | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SI | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IE | 25.07.2019 | ||
LU | 25.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
IS | 15.09.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/34] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
CY | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
MT | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IE | 25.07.2019 | ||
LU | 25.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
IS | 15.09.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
CY | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IE | 25.07.2019 | ||
LU | 25.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
IS | 15.09.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
CY | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IE | 25.07.2019 | ||
LU | 25.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IE | 25.07.2019 | ||
LU | 25.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IE | 25.07.2019 | ||
LU | 25.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LU | 25.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | NO | 15.08.2019 | |
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | NO | 15.08.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1154512 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,6* paragraph [0038]; figures 4A-4D *; | [XI]WO2006067028 (ENDRESS & HAUSER GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,14,15 * paragraph [0059]; figures 9a,9b * [I] 5-13; | [X]US2006281343 (UCHIDA SHINJI [JP], et al) [X] 1,3-5,14 * paragraph [0056]; figures 3,4 * | by applicant | US2013231011 | DE202014008843U |