15.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] |
24.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] |
17.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] |
10.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2022 [2022/28] |
03.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] |
13.08.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.09.2021 [2021/37] |
14.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.06.2021 [2021/24] |
16.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.05.2021 [2021/20] |
12.03.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.04.2021 [2021/15] |
12.03.2021 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 14.04.2021 [2021/15] |
05.03.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.04.2021 [2021/14] |
26.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.03.2021 [2021/13] |
19.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.03.2021 [2021/12] |
12.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] |
05.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.03.2021 [2021/10] |
29.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.03.2021 [2021/09] |
22.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.02.2021 [2021/08] |
25.12.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.01.2021 [2021/04] |
04.12.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.01.2021 [2021/01] |
20.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.12.2020 [2020/52] |
13.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.12.2020 [2020/51] |
13.11.2020 |
Change - applicant |
published on 16.12.2020 [2020/51] |
06.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.12.2020 [2020/50] |
30.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.12.2020 [2020/49] |
23.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.11.2020 [2020/48] |
16.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] |
09.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.11.2020 [2020/46] |
03.04.2020 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 06.05.2020 [2020/19] |
31.03.2020 |
New entry: Information about intention to grant a patent |
|
31.03.2020 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
14.03.2020 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
14.03.2020 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
14.03.2020 |
Deletion: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
13.03.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
13.03.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
14.11.2019 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
19.07.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.06.2019 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
31.01.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
25.01.2019 |
First examination report |
|
11.05.2018 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
11.05.2018 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 13.06.2018 [2018/24] |
11.05.2018 |
Change - designated states |
published on 13.06.2018 [2018/24] |
29.03.2018 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
02.02.2018 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 07.03.2018 [2018/10] |
28.07.2017 |
Change - representative |
|