EP3287394 - PICKING SYSTEM AND METHOD OF REMOVAL OF OBJECTS FROM A PICKING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.01.2019 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.02.2019 [2019/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Riedl GmbH In der Aue 9 99338 Plaue / DE | [2018/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Riedl, Markus Erich Hauptstraße 53 99338 Angelroda / DE | [2018/09] | Representative(s) | Jakelski & Althoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Mollenbachstraße 37 71229 Leonberg / DE | [2018/09] | Application number, filing date | 17184271.9 | 18.07.2016 | [2018/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3287394 | Date: | 28.02.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B65G1/04, B65G1/137 | [2018/09] | CPC: |
B65G1/0435 (EP);
B65G1/1378 (EP);
B65G1/0407 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOMMISSIONIERSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR AUSLAGERUNG VON OBJEKTEN AUS EINEM KOMMISSIONIERSYSTEM | [2018/09] | English: | PICKING SYSTEM AND METHOD OF REMOVAL OF OBJECTS FROM A PICKING SYSTEM | [2018/09] | French: | SYSTÈME DE PRÉPARATION DE COMMANDES ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉCHARGEMENT D'OBJETS A PARTIR DU SYSTÈME DE PRÉPARATION DE COMMANDES | [2018/09] | Examination procedure | 29.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/08] | 05.10.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/08] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16179953.1 / EP3272678 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2428465 (SSI SCHAEFER NOELL GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-11 * figure 2 *; | [A]DE102007016453 (SSI SCHAEFER NOELL GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-11 * figure 3 *; | [A]DE102011000481 (TGW LOGISTICS GROUP GMBH [AT]) [A] 1-11 * figure 2 *; | [A]JP2013018611 (MURATA MACHINERY LTD) [A] 1-11 * abstract *; | [A]EP2287092 (WINKLER WALTER [DE]) [A] 1-11 * figures 1-2; claims 1-15 (insbesondere 13) *; | [A]EP1604921 (STARTECHNO CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0015]; figures 1, 3, 8 *; | [A]EP1218265 (SWISSLOG DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0001]; figures 6-11; claims 1-29 *; | [A]EP1980503 (PHARMACIE AUTOMATISME SAS [FR]) [A] 1-11 * figures 3-11 *; | [A]WO03018443 (LANG HARTMUT [DE]) [A] 1-11 * abstract *; | [A]DE102004058216 (TOPIK DIDAKTIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-11 * abstract *; | [A]FR2641527 (MARTY GILLES [FR]) [A] 1-11 * figure 1; claims 1-10 *; | [A]EP0282785 (CGA HBS [FR]) [A] 1-11 * column 4; figures 1-7 *; | [A]DE102005063197 (HAAS GERHARD [DE]) [A] 1-11 * figure 1 *; | [A]DE19743793 (P & P MATERIALFLUSSYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-11 * figure 3 * | by applicant | EP2163507 | EP2428465 | DE102007016453 | EP2287092 | EP0282785 |