EP3439433 - LED PACKAGE STRUCTURE WITH WIRELESS POWER DRIVER AND LED DISPLAY THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.03.2020 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.12.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.08.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states APA Electronic Co., Ltd. 8F, No.317, Sec. 2, Chung Shan Rd. Chung Ho New Taipei City / TW | [2019/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Huang, Hsien-Jung C/O APA ELECTRONIC CO., LTD. 8F, No.317, Sec. 2 Chung Shan Rd. Chung Ho New Taipei City / TW | [2019/06] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Chaillot 16/20, avenue de l'Agent Sarre B.P. 74 92703 Colombes Cedex / FR | [2019/06] | Application number, filing date | 17184864.1 | 04.08.2017 | [2019/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3439433 | Date: | 06.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H05B33/08, H05B37/02, F21V23/00 | [2019/06] | CPC: |
H05B47/19 (EP,US);
H05B45/30 (EP,US);
F21V23/003 (EP);
H02J50/005 (EP,US);
H05B45/325 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/37] |
Former [2019/06] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LED-STRUKTUR MIT DRAHTLOSEM LEISTUNGSTREIBER UND LED-ANZEIGE DAVON | [2019/06] | English: | LED PACKAGE STRUCTURE WITH WIRELESS POWER DRIVER AND LED DISPLAY THEREOF | [2019/06] | French: | STRUCTURE DE DEL À COMMANDE DE PUISSANCE SANS FIL ET AFFICHAGE ASSOCIÉ | [2019/06] | Examination procedure | 05.08.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.08.2019 | Examination requested [2019/37] | 06.08.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.03.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2009009093 (VERNONDIER DAVID R [GB], et al) [A] 1,10 * figures 2-5 *; | [A]US8928233 (PENG WEN-CHI [TW]) [A] 2-9 * figure 1 *; | [A]US2015257242 (DEYAF HAMZA [US]) [A] 1-11 * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0045] - [0052] *; | [A]US2016265762 (YOSHIDA ICHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0043] , [0045] - [0049] - [0051]; figure 1 *; | [A]WO2016176653 (S R SMITH LLC [US]) [A] 1-11 * figure 5 * * paragraphs [0035] - [0038] - [0 40] , [0041] , [0 51] , [0 52] , [0 55] *; | [X]US2016330823 (HWA ALEC [TW], et al) [X] 1-11 * figures 2, 7 * * paragraphs [0025] , [0029] , [0030] , [0068] , [0077] - [0087] *; | [A]US2017135187 (ZHANG WANG [CN], et al) [A] 1,4,11 * figure 1A ** paragraphs [0014] , [0 19] - [0021] * |