EP3282521 - PLUG CONNECTOR SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.04.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.10.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TE Connectivity Germany GmbH Ampèrestraße 12-14 64625 Bensheim / DE | [2018/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GIMBEL, Markus Windenhofweg 18 92342 Freystadt / DE | 02 /
WALZ, Alexander Kirchstr. 24 69155 Heidelberg / DE | [2018/07] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2018/07] | Application number, filing date | 17186078.6 | 14.08.2017 | [2018/07] | Priority number, date | DE201610215123 | 12.08.2016 Original published format: DE102016215123 | [2018/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3282521 | Date: | 14.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3282521 | Date: | 16.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3282521 | Date: | 31.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/436, H01R13/627, H01R13/641, H01R13/73, // H01R13/422, H01R13/639 | [2018/20] | CPC: |
H01R13/6272 (EP);
H01R13/4362 (EP);
H01R13/641 (EP);
H01R13/73 (EP);
H01R13/4223 (EP);
H01R13/639 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2018/07] | H01R13/436, H01R13/627, H01R13/641 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/46] |
Former [2018/07] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | STECKVERBINDERSYSTEM | [2018/07] | English: | PLUG CONNECTOR SYSTEM | [2018/07] | French: | SYSTÈME DE CONNECTEUR ÉLECTRIQUE | [2018/07] | Examination procedure | 08.10.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.10.2018 | Examination requested [2018/46] | 08.10.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4984998 (DUNCAN FRANK L [US], et al); | [X]US5641300 (CORRION WESLEY RICHARD [US]); | [Y]US5947763 (ALAKSIN PAUL H [US]); | [XY]US6203364 (CHUPAK JOHN M [US], et al); | [XY]US2010136819 (MASE TSUYOSHI [JP], et al); | [A]WO2013076961 (YAZAKI CORP [JP]) | Examination | US4634204 |