EP3301180 - TOBACCO PLANTS HAVING REDUCED NICOTINE DEMETHYLASE ACTIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.07.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.11.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states U.S. Smokeless Tobacco Company LLC 6603 West Broad Street Richmond, VA 23230 / US | [2018/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Xu, Dongmei 3020 Charleston Gardens Boulevard Lexington, KY 40515 / US | 02 /
Nielsen, Mark T. 116 Paddock Drive Nicholasville, KY 40356 / US | 03 /
Shen, Yanxin 11913 Amberwood Lane Glen Allen, VA 23059 / US | [2018/14] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/14] | Kunz, Herbert Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 80807 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17186176.8 | 13.12.2007 | [2018/14] | Priority number, date | US20060611782 | 15.12.2006 Original published format: US 611782 | [2018/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3301180 | Date: | 04.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/82, A01H1/00 | [2018/14] | CPC: |
C12N9/0073 (EP,US);
C12N15/8251 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/14] | Title | German: | TABAKPFLANZEN MIT VERMINDERTER NIKOTINDEMETHYLSEAKTIVITÄT | [2018/14] | English: | TOBACCO PLANTS HAVING REDUCED NICOTINE DEMETHYLASE ACTIVITY | [2018/14] | French: | PLANTES DE TABAC BÉNÉFICIANT D'UNE ACTIVITÉ DE DÉMÉTHYLASE DE NICOTINE RÉDUITE | [2018/14] | Examination procedure | 14.08.2017 | Examination requested [2018/14] | 14.08.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.10.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.04.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/35] | 30.04.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/35] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07865628.7 / EP2121941 | EP12175334.7 / EP2537939 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 28.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 27.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 27.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 27.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 17 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2004035745 (US SMOKELESS TOBACCO CO [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [I]US2005223442 (XU DONGMEI [US]) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2005111217 (US SMOKELESS TOBACCO CO [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * figures 5, 6; claims 1-94; sequences 5, 6 *; | [X]US2006041949 (XU DONGMEI [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [XP]US2007199097 (XU DONGMEI [US], et al) [XP] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [E]WO2008076802 (US SMOKELESS TOBACCO CO [US], et al) [E] 1-15* the whole document * | by applicant | US4732856 | US5013658 | US5149645 | US2005178398 | US2006191548 | - WERCK-REICHHART; FEYEREISEN, Genome Biology, (20000000), vol. 1, page 3003 | EP20120175334 |