EP3299393 - SINGLE DOMAIN ANTIBODIES DIRECTED AGAINST TUMOUR NECROSIS FACTOR-ALPHA AND USES THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.02.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.03.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ablynx N.V. Technologiepark 21 9052 Ghent-Zwijnaarde / BE | [2018/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Silence, Karen Jean Tombeurstraat 21 3090 Overijse / BE | 02 /
Lauwereys, Marc Wilgenstraat 2 9450 Haaltert / BE | 03 /
De Haard, Hans 't Zwint 1 4436 NA Oudelande / NL | [2018/13] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2018/13] | Application number, filing date | 17186411.9 | 07.11.2003 | [2018/13] | Priority number, date | US20020425073P | 08.11.2002 Original published format: US 425073 P | US20020425063P | 08.11.2002 Original published format: US 425063 P | EP20030447005 | 10.01.2003 Original published format: EP 03447005 | WO2003EP06581 | 23.06.2003 Original published format: PCT/EP0306/581 | WO2003EP07313 | 08.07.2003 Original published format: PCT/EP0307/313 | [2018/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3299393 | Date: | 28.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/42, C07K16/24, C07K16/30, C07K16/12, C07K16/10, C07K16/40, C07K16/28, C12N15/13, A61K39/395, A61P11/06, A61P35/00, A61P31/06, A61P31/16 | [2018/13] | CPC: |
C07K16/2863 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/14 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P13/00 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P15/08 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P21/04 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/16 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/06 (EP);
A61P31/16 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/00 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P7/06 (EP);
A61P9/08 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07K16/18 (EP,US);
C07K16/241 (EP,RU,US);
C07K16/249 (EP,US);
C07K16/2875 (EP,US);
C07K16/36 (EP,US);
C07K16/40 (EP,US);
C07K16/4291 (EP,US);
C07K16/468 (RU);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
C07K2317/22 (EP,US);
C07K2317/24 (EP,US);
C07K2317/31 (EP,US);
C07K2317/565 (EP,US);
C07K2317/569 (EP,US);
C07K2317/62 (EP,US);
C07K2317/626 (EP,US);
C07K2317/76 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/13] | Extension states | AL | 16.08.2017 | LT | 16.08.2017 | LV | 16.08.2017 | MK | 16.08.2017 | Title | German: | GEGEN DEN TUMORNEKROSEFAKTOR-ALPHA GERICHTETE ANTIKÖRPER MIT EINFACHER DOMÄNE UND VERWENDUNGEN DAFÜR | [2018/13] | English: | SINGLE DOMAIN ANTIBODIES DIRECTED AGAINST TUMOUR NECROSIS FACTOR-ALPHA AND USES THEREFOR | [2018/13] | French: | ANTICORPS À DOMAINE UNIQUE DIRIGÉS CONTRE LE FACTEUR ALPHA DE LA NÉCROSE TUMORALE ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2018/13] | Examination procedure | 16.08.2017 | Examination requested [2018/13] | 16.08.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/11] | 05.11.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/11] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03776676.3 / EP1558647 | EP10182757.4 / EP2390268 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 16.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 16.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 16.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 16.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 16.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 23.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 26.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 17 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9102078 (PEPTIDE TECHNOLOGY LTD [AU]) [X] 1-15 * page 4, line 6 - page 5, line 24 *; | [XI] - VALLE E ET AL, "Infliximab", EXPERT OPINION ON PHARMACOTHERAPY, ASHLEY PUBLICATIONS LTD, LONDON, UK, (20010601), vol. 2, doi:10.1517/14656566.2.6.1015, ISSN 1465-6566, pages 1015 - 1025, XP002965315 [X] 1-6,11-15 * page 1018, column 1, paragraph 2 - page 1023, column 2, paragraph 1 * [I] 7-10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1517/14656566.2.6.1015 | [A] - CORTEZ-RETAMOZO VIRNA ET AL, "Efficient tumor targeting by single-domain antibody fragments of camels", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF CANCER, (20020320), vol. 98, no. 3, ISSN 0020-7136, pages 456 - 462, XP002638671 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 457, column r, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ijc.10212 | [A] - K. ELS CONRATH ET AL, "Camel Single-domain Antibodies as Modular Building Units in Bispecific and Bivalent Antibody Constructs", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (20001025), vol. 276, no. 10, doi:10.1074/jbc.M007734200, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 7346 - 7350, XP055331073 [A] 1-15 * page 7346 * * page 7349 - page 7350 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M007734200 | [A] - SERGE MUYLDERMANS, "Single domain camel antibodies: current status", REVIEWS IN MOLECULAR BIOTECHNOLOGY, NL, (20010601), vol. 74, no. 4, doi:10.1016/S1389-0352(01)00021-6, ISSN 1389-0352, pages 277 - 302, XP055277195 [A] 1-15 * page 280 - page 298; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1389-0352(01)00021-6 | by applicant | EP0486526 | US6448380 | US6451983 | US6498237 | EP0663836 | US5672347 | US5656272 | EP0585705 | WO9749805 | EP0698097 | US6180370 | US5693761 | US6054297 | US460167 | EP0626390 | US5859205 | US5869619 | US5766886 | US5821123 | WO9404678 | WO03035694 | EP0294703 | WO9634103 | EP0707473 | EP0684814 | US5629001 | US5399346 | US4608392 | US4992478 | US4559157 | US4820508 | US4938949 | WO0002045 | - LAUWEREYS et al., EMBO J., (19980000), vol. 17, page 5312 | - PEREZ et al., Biochemistry, (20010000), vol. 40, page 74 | - DUMOULIN et al., Protein Science, (20020000), vol. 11, page 500 | - BLATTLER et al., Biochemistry, vol. 24, pages 1517 - 1524 | - SAMBROOK et al., Molecular Cloning, Laboratory Manuel, Cold Spring, Harbor Laboratory press | - SALAMON et al., Biophys J., (19960000), vol. 71, pages 283 - 294 | - SALAMON et al., Biophys. J., (20010000), vol. 80, pages 1557 - 1567 | - SALAMON et al., Trends Biochem. Sci., (19990000), vol. 24, pages 213 - 219 | - SARRIO et al., Mol. Cell. Biol., (20000000), vol. 20, pages 5164 - 5174 | - Cornell B, Braach-Maksvytis V, King L, Osman P, Raguse B, Wieczorek L, and Pace R., "A biosensor that uses ion-channel switches", Nature, vol. 387, doi:doi:10.1038/42432, page 580, XP002140886 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/42432 | - Martin, E.W., Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, 4th ed., Mack Publishing Co. | - MAGNI et al., Anal Biochem, (20010000), vol. 298, pages 181 - 188 | - VANDENABEELE, P.; DECLERCQ, W.; VERCAMMEN, D.; VAN DE CRAEN, M.; GROOTEN, J.; LOETSCHER, H.; BROCKHAUS, M.; LESSLAUER, W.; FIERS,, "Functional characterization of the human tumor necrosis factor receptor p75 in a transfected rat/mouse T cell hybridoma", J. Exp. Med., (19920000), vol. 176, pages 1015 - 1024 | - SEKIGUCHI M; SHIROKO Y; SUZUKI T; IMADA M; MIYAHARA M; FUJII G, "Characterization of a human rhabdomyosarcoma cell strain in tissue culture", Biomed. Pharmacother., (19850000), vol. 39, pages 372 - 380 | - HARMSEN et al., Mol. Immunol., vol. 37, pages 579 - 590 | - SANTORA et al., Anal.Biochem., vol. 299, pages 119 - 129 | - J. Biol. Chem., (19210000), vol. 49, page 183 | - OKAYASU et al., Gastroenterology, (19900000), vol. 98, pages 694 - 702 | - G. KOJOUHAROFF et al., Clin. Exp. Immunol., (19970000), vol. 107, pages 353 - 8 | EP20010205100 | WO2002EP07804 |