EP3287042 - PULL-OUT GUIDE FOR FURNITURE PARTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.08.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.09.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.06.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.08.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states REME-Möbelbeschläge GmbH Industriestraße 48 33161 Hövelhof / DE | [2019/41] |
Former [2018/09] | For all designated states Reme-möbelbeschläge GmbH Industriestraße 48 33161 Hövelhof / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meier, Bruno Sennestr. 17 33161 Hövelhof / DE | [2018/09] | Representative(s) | Ostermann, Thomas Fiedler, Ostermann & Schneider Patentanwälte Klausheider Strasse 31 33106 Paderborn / DE | [2018/09] | Application number, filing date | 17186575.1 | 17.08.2017 | [2018/09] | Priority number, date | DE201620104578U | 22.08.2016 Original published format: DE 202016104578 U | [2018/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3287042 | Date: | 28.02.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3287042 | Date: | 09.10.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A47B88/427 | [2018/09] | CPC: |
A47B88/427 (EP);
A47B2088/4276 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/37] |
Former [2018/09] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | AUSZUGSFÜHRUNG FÜR MÖBELTEILE | [2018/09] | English: | PULL-OUT GUIDE FOR FURNITURE PARTS | [2018/09] | French: | GLISSIÈRE DE TIROIR POUR PARTIES DE MEUBLE | [2018/09] | Examination procedure | 17.08.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.08.2018 | Examination requested [2018/37] | 24.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.06.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 28.08.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 28.08.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.07.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.08.2017 | AL | 09.10.2019 | CY | 09.10.2019 | CZ | 09.10.2019 | DK | 09.10.2019 | EE | 09.10.2019 | ES | 09.10.2019 | FI | 09.10.2019 | HR | 09.10.2019 | IT | 09.10.2019 | LT | 09.10.2019 | LV | 09.10.2019 | MC | 09.10.2019 | MK | 09.10.2019 | MT | 09.10.2019 | NL | 09.10.2019 | PL | 09.10.2019 | RO | 09.10.2019 | RS | 09.10.2019 | SE | 09.10.2019 | SI | 09.10.2019 | SK | 09.10.2019 | SM | 09.10.2019 | TR | 09.10.2019 | BG | 09.01.2020 | NO | 09.01.2020 | GR | 10.01.2020 | IS | 09.02.2020 | PT | 10.02.2020 | [2022/33] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 17.08.2017 | |
AL | 09.10.2019 | ||
CY | 09.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
IT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
MC | 09.10.2019 | ||
MT | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SI | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
TR | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2021/18] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
IT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
MC | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SI | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
IT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SI | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
IT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 09.10.2019 | |
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | ES | 09.10.2019 | |
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RS | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | ES | 09.10.2019 | |
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | ES | 09.10.2019 | |
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 09.10.2019 | |
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NL | 09.10.2019 | |
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/20] | NL | 09.10.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE9318383U (BLUM GMBH JULIUS [AT]) [A] 1-14 * figures 1,4,9,10 *; | [A]GB2354933 (ACCURIDE INT LTD [GB]) [A] 1-14 * page 4, line 31 - page 5, line 6 * * figures 1-3 *; | [XAI]WO2007096156 (ALFIT AG [AT], et al) [X] 1,2,4,11,12,14 * page 8, paragraph 2 * * figures 1,2,3,4 * [A] 3,5-10 [I] 13; | [AD]DE202009013830U (REME MOEBELBESCHLAEGE GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-14* the whole document * | by applicant | DE202009013830U | DE202010018353U |