blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3281939

EP3281939 - COMBINATION COMPRISING A STABLE CRYSTAL OF A 4-OXOQUINOLINE COMPOUND [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2018/07]METHOD OF PRODUCING STABLE CRYSTAL OF 4-OXOQUINOLINE COMPOUND
[2023/13]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.08.2024
Database last updated on 05.05.2025
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.09.2023
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  28.03.2023
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  23.07.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  17.08.2018
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  12.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip22.08.2024No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 25.09.2024  [2024/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Japan Tobacco Inc.
1-1, Toranomon 4-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-6927 / JP
[2020/50]
Former [2018/07]For all designated states
Japan Tobacco Inc.
2-1 Toranomon 2-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-8422 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / SATOH, Motohide
c/o Central Pharmaceutical Research Institute
1-1, Murasaki-cho, Takatsuki-shi
Osaka, Osaka 569-1125 / JP
02 / MOTOMURA, Takahisa
c/o Central Pharmaceutical Research Institute
1-1, Murasaki-cho, Takatsuki-shi
Osaka, Osaka 569-1125 / JP
03 / MATSUDA, Takashi
c/o Central Pharmaceutical Research Institute
1-1, Murasaki-cho, Takatsuki-shi
Osaka, Osaka 569-1125 / JP
04 / KONDO, Kentaro
c/o Central Pharmaceutical Research Institute
1-1, Murasaki-cho, Takatsuki-shi
Osaka, Osaka 569-1125 / JP
05 / ANDO, Koji
c/o Central Pharmaceutical Research Institute
1-1, Murasaki-cho, Takatsuki-shi
Osaka, Osaka 569-1125 / JP
06 / MATSUDA, Koji
c/o Central Pharmaceutical Research Institute
1-1, Murasaki-cho, Takatsuki-shi
Osaka, Osaka 569-1125 / JP
07 / MIYAKE, Shuji
c/o Central Pharmaceutical Research Institute
1-1, Murasaki-cho, Takatsuki-shi
Osaka, Osaka 569-1125 / JP
08 / UEHARA, Hideto
c/o Central Pharmaceutical Research Institute
1-1, Murasaki-cho, Takatsuki-shi
Osaka, Okayama 569-1125 / JP
 [2018/07]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[2018/07]
Application number, filing date17186674.219.05.2005
[2018/07]
Priority number, dateJP2004015097920.05.2004         Original published format: JP 2004150979
[2018/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3281939
Date:14.02.2018
Language:EN
[2018/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3281939
Date:18.10.2023
Language:EN
[2023/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.12.2017
ClassificationIPC:A61K31/47, A61P31/18, C07D215/56
[2023/13]
CPC:
C07D215/56 (EP,KR,NO,US); A61K31/47 (KR,NO); A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP,NO)
Former IPC [2018/07]C07D215/56
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2018/38]
Former [2018/07]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesAL13.08.2018
BA13.08.2018
HR13.08.2018
LV13.08.2018
MK13.08.2018
YU13.08.2018
TitleGerman:KOMBINATION ENTHALTEND EINEN STABILEN KRISTALL EINER 4-OXOCHINOLIN-VERBINDUNG[2023/13]
English:COMBINATION COMPRISING A STABLE CRYSTAL OF A 4-OXOQUINOLINE COMPOUND[2023/13]
French:COMBINAISON COMPRENANT UN CRISTAL STABLE D'UN COMPOSÉ 4-OXOQUINOLINE[2023/13]
Former [2018/07]METHODE ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES STABILEN KRISTALLS EINER 4-OXOCHINOLINVERBINDUNG
Former [2018/07]METHOD OF PRODUCING STABLE CRYSTAL OF 4-OXOQUINOLINE COMPOUND
Former [2018/07]MÉTHODE POUR PRÉPARATION D'UN CRISTAL STABLE DE COMPOSÉ 4-OXOQUINOLINE
Examination procedure17.08.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
13.08.2018Examination requested  [2018/38]
22.11.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.07.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.09.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.09.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.09.2020Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.03.2021Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.12.2021Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.01.2023Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.02.2023Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.03.2023Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.08.2023Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
05.09.2023Fee for grant paid
05.09.2023Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.09.2023Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP05726243.8  / EP1636190
EP12173572.4  / EP2514746
Divisional application(s)EP23203885.1  / EP4299563
Opposition(s)19.07.2024No opposition filed within time limit [2024/39]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent
05.09.2023Request for further processing filed
05.09.2023Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
12.09.2023Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
28.12.2021Request for further processing filed
28.12.2021Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
14.01.2022Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
03.09.2020Request for further processing filed
03.09.2020Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
14.09.2020Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
22.11.2018Request for further processing filed
22.11.2018Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
04.12.2018Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
27.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
27.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
27.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
27.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
27.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
27.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
27.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
27.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
27.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 12
27.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 13
23.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 14
22.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 15
31.03.2020Renewal fee patent year 16
21.05.2021Renewal fee patent year 17
30.03.2022Renewal fee patent year 18
30.03.2023Renewal fee patent year 19
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US3472859  (LESHER GEORGE Y);
 [A]WO9845269  (CENTRE NAT RECH SCIENT [FR], et al);
 [E]EP1564210  (JAPAN TOBACCO INC [JP])
by applicantJPS567162B
 JP2004150979
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.