Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3287731 | Global Dossier | 10.04.2019 | B1 | EP3287731 | 28.02.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE1651142 | 25.08.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK3287731T | 15.07.2019 | T3 | Priority number | Date | SE1651142 | 25.08.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SE541261 | 21.05.2019 | C2 | SE1651142 | 26.02.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE1651142 | 25.08.2016 |