EP3309640 - GROUP DRIVING STYLE LEARNING FRAMEWORK FOR AUTONOMOUS VEHICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.06.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.07.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.03.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.02.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.10.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.12.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baidu USA LLC 1195 Bordeaux Drive Sunnyvale, California 94089 / US | [2018/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jiang, Yifei 1195 Bordeaux Dr. Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | 02 /
Li, Dong 1195 Bordeaux Dr. Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | 03 /
Tao, Jiaming 1195 Bordeaux Dr. Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | 04 /
Hu, Jiangtao 1195 Bordeaux Dr. Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | 05 /
Li, Liyun 1195 Bordeaux Dr. Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | 06 /
Yang, Guang 1195 Bordeaux Dr. Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | 07 /
Wang, Jingao 1195 Bordeaux Dr. Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | [2018/16] | Representative(s) | Schnappauf, Georg ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Hansastraße 32 80686 München / DE | [2018/16] | Application number, filing date | 17187053.8 | 21.08.2017 | [2018/16] | Priority number, date | US201615292970 | 13.10.2016 Original published format: US201615292970 | [2018/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3309640 | Date: | 18.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3309640 | Date: | 20.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3309640 | Date: | 11.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G05D1/00, G05D1/02, B60W30/095 | [2018/16] | CPC: |
G08G1/096725 (EP,CN,US);
G05D1/021 (CN);
B60W30/09 (US);
B60W30/0956 (EP,US);
B60W40/09 (CN);
B60W60/0016 (US);
G05D1/0011 (US);
G05D1/0291 (EP,US);
G06N20/00 (EP,CN,US);
G08G1/0112 (EP,US);
G08G1/0129 (EP,US);
G08G1/0145 (EP,US);
G08G1/096775 (EP,US);
G08G1/096791 (EP,US);
B60W2050/0075 (EP,US);
B60W2420/403 (US);
B60W2420/408 (US);
B60W2552/53 (US);
B60W2554/20 (US);
B60W2554/4029 (US);
B60W2554/80 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/05] |
Former [2018/16] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | GRUPPENFAHRSTILLERNRAHMEN FÜR AUTONOME FAHRZEUGE | [2018/16] | English: | GROUP DRIVING STYLE LEARNING FRAMEWORK FOR AUTONOMOUS VEHICLES | [2018/16] | French: | CADRE D'APPRENTISSAGE DE STYLE DE CONDUITE DE GROUPE POUR VÉHICULES AUTONOMES | [2018/16] | Examination procedure | 19.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.12.2018 | Examination requested [2019/05] | 19.12.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.02.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 11.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.07.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 12.05.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.08.2017 | AL | 11.08.2021 | AT | 11.08.2021 | CY | 11.08.2021 | CZ | 11.08.2021 | DK | 11.08.2021 | EE | 11.08.2021 | ES | 11.08.2021 | FI | 11.08.2021 | HR | 11.08.2021 | IT | 11.08.2021 | LT | 11.08.2021 | LV | 11.08.2021 | MC | 11.08.2021 | MK | 11.08.2021 | MT | 11.08.2021 | NL | 11.08.2021 | PL | 11.08.2021 | RO | 11.08.2021 | RS | 11.08.2021 | SE | 11.08.2021 | SI | 11.08.2021 | SK | 11.08.2021 | SM | 11.08.2021 | IE | 21.08.2021 | LU | 21.08.2021 | BE | 31.08.2021 | CH | 31.08.2021 | LI | 31.08.2021 | BG | 11.11.2021 | NO | 11.11.2021 | GR | 12.11.2021 | IS | 11.12.2021 | PT | 13.12.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 21.08.2017 | |
AL | 11.08.2021 | ||
AT | 11.08.2021 | ||
CY | 11.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
IT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
MC | 11.08.2021 | ||
MK | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SI | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
IE | 21.08.2021 | ||
LU | 21.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 21.08.2017 | |
AL | 11.08.2021 | ||
AT | 11.08.2021 | ||
CY | 11.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
IT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
MC | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SI | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
IE | 21.08.2021 | ||
LU | 21.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 21.08.2017 | |
AL | 11.08.2021 | ||
AT | 11.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
IT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
MC | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SI | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
IE | 21.08.2021 | ||
LU | 21.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 11.08.2021 | |
AT | 11.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
IT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
MC | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SI | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
IE | 21.08.2021 | ||
LU | 21.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 11.08.2021 | |
AT | 11.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
MC | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
IE | 21.08.2021 | ||
LU | 21.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 11.08.2021 | |
AT | 11.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
MC | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
LU | 21.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/27] | AL | 11.08.2021 | |
AT | 11.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
MC | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
LU | 21.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 11.08.2021 | |
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
MC | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
SM | 11.08.2021 | ||
LU | 21.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 11.08.2021 | |
CZ | 11.08.2021 | ||
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
EE | 11.08.2021 | ||
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RO | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
SK | 11.08.2021 | ||
LU | 21.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 11.08.2021 | |
DK | 11.08.2021 | ||
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
CH | 31.08.2021 | ||
LI | 31.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/16] | AT | 11.08.2021 | |
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
NL | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 11.08.2021 | |
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
HR | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
LV | 11.08.2021 | ||
PL | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
GR | 12.11.2021 | ||
IS | 11.12.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 11.08.2021 | |
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
RS | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
PT | 13.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 11.08.2021 | |
ES | 11.08.2021 | ||
FI | 11.08.2021 | ||
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
SE | 11.08.2021 | ||
BG | 11.11.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 11.08.2021 | |
LT | 11.08.2021 | ||
NO | 11.11.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2013261872 (FERGUSON DAVID IAN FRANKLIN [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-8,10-12 * the whole document * [A] 5,9; | [A]WO2014130178 (GOOGLE INC [US]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]US2015012167 (WOLTER STEFAN [DE]) [A] 1-12* the whole document *; | [XA]US2015309512 (CUDAK GARY D [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-8,10-12 * the whole document * [A] 5,9 |