EP3309657 - ROLE-BASED PROVISION OF VIRTUAL REALITY ENVIRONMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.08.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.09.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Accenture Global Solutions Limited 3 Grand Canal Plaza Grand Canal Street Upper Dublin 4 / IE | [2018/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHAFER, Ian C. 33 Elmwood Dr. Tabernacle, NJ New Jersey 08088 / US | 02 /
AMER, Spencer 201 East 86th St. Apt. No. 15H New York, NY 10028 / US | 03 /
BATRA, Rishi B-808, Royal Towers Sec 61, Noida 201301 Uttar Pradesh / IN | 04 /
KANG, Daniel L. 1159 N Hudson Ave Apt 6 Chicago, IL Illinois 60610 / US | 05 /
LANIER, Ruth Ann 301 E. 63rd St, Apt 11H New York, NY New York 10065 / US | [2018/16] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2018/16] | Application number, filing date | 17187238.5 | 22.08.2017 | [2018/16] | Priority number, date | IN201641028617 | 23.08.2016 Original published format: IN201641028617 | US201715596567 | 16.05.2017 Original published format: US201715596567 | [2018/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3309657 | Date: | 18.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3309657 | Date: | 10.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/01 | [2018/16] | CPC: |
G06F3/011 (EP,US);
G06T11/60 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/42] |
Former [2018/16] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ROLLENBASIERTE BEREITSTELLUNG EINER VIRTUELLEN REALITÄTSUMGEBUNG | [2018/16] | English: | ROLE-BASED PROVISION OF VIRTUAL REALITY ENVIRONMENT | [2018/16] | French: | FOURNITURE D'ENVIRONNEMENT DE RÉALITÉ VIRTUELLE BASÉE SUR LES RÔLES | [2018/16] | Examination procedure | 22.08.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.09.2018 | Examination requested [2018/42] | 20.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 30.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.01.2024 | BG | 10.01.2024 | ES | 10.01.2024 | HR | 10.01.2024 | LT | 10.01.2024 | LV | 10.01.2024 | NL | 10.01.2024 | PL | 10.01.2024 | SE | 10.01.2024 | NO | 10.04.2024 | RS | 10.04.2024 | GR | 11.04.2024 | IS | 10.05.2024 | PT | 10.05.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 10.01.2024 | |
BG | 10.01.2024 | ||
ES | 10.01.2024 | ||
HR | 10.01.2024 | ||
LT | 10.01.2024 | ||
LV | 10.01.2024 | ||
NL | 10.01.2024 | ||
PL | 10.01.2024 | ||
NO | 10.04.2024 | ||
RS | 10.04.2024 | ||
GR | 11.04.2024 | ||
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
PT | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 10.01.2024 | |
BG | 10.01.2024 | ||
ES | 10.01.2024 | ||
HR | 10.01.2024 | ||
LT | 10.01.2024 | ||
NL | 10.01.2024 | ||
NO | 10.04.2024 | ||
RS | 10.04.2024 | ||
GR | 11.04.2024 | ||
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 10.01.2024 | |
HR | 10.01.2024 | ||
LT | 10.01.2024 | ||
NL | 10.01.2024 | ||
NO | 10.04.2024 | ||
RS | 10.04.2024 | ||
GR | 11.04.2024 | ||
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 10.01.2024 | |
NL | 10.01.2024 | ||
NO | 10.04.2024 | ||
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | NL | 10.01.2024 | |
IS | 10.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/31] | NL | 10.01.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2013293468 (PEREZ KATHRYN STONE [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2014134196 (EASTERN VIRGINIA MED SCHOOL [US]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [I]WO2016071244 (KONINKL PHILIPS NV [NL]) [I] 1,7,8 * page 7 - page 8; figure 1 *; | [X]WO2016130161 (HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERVICES INC [US]) [X] 1-15 * page 2, lines 13-14 * * page 5 - page 9 * * page 10, lines 26-34 * * figures 1-10 * |