EP3447517 - DIXON-TYPE WATER/FAT SEPARATION MR IMAGING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.01.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.02.2020 [2020/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2019/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EGGERS, Holger c/o Philips International B.V. Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2019/09] | Representative(s) | de Haan, Poul Erik, et al Philips International B.V. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2019/09] | Application number, filing date | 17187711.1 | 24.08.2017 | [2019/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3447517 | Date: | 27.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/48, G01R33/561, // G01R33/56, G01R33/565 | [2019/09] | CPC: |
G01R33/4828 (EP,US);
G01R33/5615 (EP);
G01R33/5616 (EP,US);
G01R33/56554 (EP,US);
G01R33/56563 (EP,US);
G01R33/56 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WASSER-FETT-TRENNUNG NACH DIXON-VERFAHREN MIT MR-TOMOGRAFIE | [2019/09] | English: | DIXON-TYPE WATER/FAT SEPARATION MR IMAGING | [2019/09] | French: | IMAGERIE RM AVEC SÉPARATION EAU/GRAISSE DE TYPE DIXON | [2019/09] | Examination procedure | 28.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/06] | 11.09.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/06] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2019 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD] - WENMIAO LU ET AL, "Water-fat separation with bipolar multiecho sequences", MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE, (20080625), vol. 60, no. 1, doi:10.1002/mrm.21583, ISSN 0740-3194, pages 198 - 209, XP055138008 [AD] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/mrm.21583 | [A] - MARIA I ALTBACH* ET AL, "Chemical-Shift Imaging Utilizing the Positional Shifts Along the Readout Gradient Direction", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MEDICAL IMAGING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20011101), vol. 20, no. 11, ISSN 0278-0062, XP011036156 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | [AD] - HOLGER EGGERS ET AL, "Dual-Echo Dixon Imaging with Flexible Choice of Echo Times", MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDI, 2010 WILEY-LISS, INC, (20100921), vol. 65, no. 1, doi:DOI 10.1002/MRM.22578, pages 96 - 107, XP007919288 [AD] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/DOI 10.1002/mrm.22578 | [AD] - JINGFEI MA, "A Single-Point Dixon Technique for Fat-Suppressed Fast 3D Gradient-Echo Imaging With a Flexible Echo Time", JOURNAL OF MAGNETIC RESONANCE IMA, 2008 WILEY-LISS, INC, (20080226), vol. 27, no. 4, doi:DOI 10.1002/JMRI.21281, pages 881 - 890, XP007919289 [AD] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/DOI 10.1002/jmri.21281 | by applicant | - EGGERS et al., Magn. Reson. Med., (20110000), vol. 65, pages 96 - 107 | - LU et al., "Water-fat separation with bipolar multi-echo sequences", Magn. Reson. Med., (20080000), vol. 60, pages 198 - 209 | - EGGERS et al., "Dual-echo Dixon imaging with flexible choice of echo times", Magn. Reson. Med., (20110000), vol. 65, doi:doi:DOI 10.1002/mrm.22578, pages 96 - 107, XP007919288 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/DOI 10.1002/mrm.22578 | - MA, "A single-point Dixon technique for fat-suppressed fast 3D gradient-echo imaging with a flexible echo time", J. Magn. Reson. Imaging, (20080000), vol. 27, doi:doi:DOI 10.1002/jmri.21281, pages 881 - 890, XP007919289 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/DOI 10.1002/jmri.21281 |