EP3290341 - ELECTRICALLY CONDUCTIVE MATERIALS FOR HEATING AND DEICING AIRFOILS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 09.05.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.01.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.01.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.09.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 18.12.2024 [2024/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Boeing Company 929 Long Bridge Drive Arlington, VA 22202 / US | [2023/12] |
Former [2018/10] | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KINLEN, Patrick J. 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US | 02 /
YOUNG, Kenneth W. 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US | [2018/10] | Representative(s) | Harris, Jennifer Lucy Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2018/10] | Application number, filing date | 17187914.1 | 25.08.2017 | [2018/10] | Priority number, date | US201615252056 | 30.08.2016 Original published format: US201615252056 | [2018/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3290341 | Date: | 07.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3290341 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B64D15/12, H01B1/12, H05B3/14 | [2018/10] | CPC: |
B64D15/12 (EP,CN,US);
H01B1/124 (CN);
B64C27/46 (US);
H01B1/122 (EP,US);
H01B1/127 (CN);
H01B1/128 (CN);
H05B3/145 (EP,US);
H05B3/146 (EP,US);
H05B2203/037 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/10] | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCH LEITENDE MATERIALIEN ZUM HEIZEN UND ENTEISEN VON TRAGFLÄCHEN | [2018/10] | English: | ELECTRICALLY CONDUCTIVE MATERIALS FOR HEATING AND DEICING AIRFOILS | [2018/10] | French: | MATÉRIAUX ÉLECTROCONDUCTEURS DE CHAUFFAGE ET DE DÉGIVRAGE DE SURFACES PORTANTES | [2018/10] | Examination procedure | 25.08.2017 | Examination requested [2018/10] | 25.08.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.01.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 23.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 16.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23164264.6 / EP4234408 | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.07.2023 | BG | 26.07.2023 | CZ | 26.07.2023 | DK | 26.07.2023 | EE | 26.07.2023 | FI | 26.07.2023 | HR | 26.07.2023 | LT | 26.07.2023 | LV | 26.07.2023 | MC | 26.07.2023 | NL | 26.07.2023 | PL | 26.07.2023 | RO | 26.07.2023 | RS | 26.07.2023 | SE | 26.07.2023 | SI | 26.07.2023 | SK | 26.07.2023 | SM | 26.07.2023 | IE | 25.08.2023 | LU | 25.08.2023 | CH | 31.08.2023 | NO | 26.10.2023 | GR | 27.10.2023 | IS | 26.11.2023 | PT | 27.11.2023 | [2024/51] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
CZ | 26.07.2023 | ||
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
EE | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
MC | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SI | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
IE | 25.08.2023 | ||
LU | 25.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
CZ | 26.07.2023 | ||
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
EE | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
MC | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
IE | 25.08.2023 | ||
LU | 25.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
CZ | 26.07.2023 | ||
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
EE | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
MC | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
LU | 25.08.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
CZ | 26.07.2023 | ||
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
LU | 25.08.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
LU | 25.08.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 26.07.2023 | |
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/05] | NL | 26.07.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5064574 (OLDHAM SUSAN L [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0591951 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [A]US6552107 (PAUL RAJI KANNAPARAMPIL [IN], et al) [A] 1-14* the whole document *; | [A]WO2008085550 (BATTELLE MEMORIAL INSTITUTE [US], et al) [A] 6-14 * abstract *; | [Y]WO2010028653 (VESTAS WIND SYS AS [DK], et al) [Y] 6-14 * claims 1,9,10 * * figure - *; | [Y]US2012138589 (MITCHELL KATHERINE P [US], et al) [Y] 6-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0089] - paragraph [0102] *; | [XYI]US2014363291 (GAILLARDON BASTIEN [FR], et al) [X] 1,2,4 * the whole document * [Y] 6-14 [I] 3,5 |