EP3412337 - FLEXIBLE BAND TINE ARRAY, PARTICULARLY FOR AN IMPLANTABLE CARDIAC PACEMAKER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.06.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.11.2020 [2020/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BIOTRONIK SE & Co. KG Woermannkehre 1 12359 Berlin / DE | [2018/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Momma, Carsten Gertrudenstrasse 4 18057 Rostock / DE | 02 /
Suwito, Wantjinarjo 2150 Ridgebrook Drive West Linn, OR Oregon 97068 / US | 03 /
von Arx, Jeffrey A. 3700 Upper Drive Lake Oswego, OR Oregon 97035 / US | 04 /
Frotscher, Matthias Klockenbrink 2 18109 Rostock / DE | 05 /
Bosselmann, Marco Falckenbergstrasse 10 18059 Rostock / DE | [2018/50] | Representative(s) | Keck, Hans-Georg Biotronik Corporate Services SE Corporate Intellectual Property Sieversufer 7 - 9 12359 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/50] | Keck, Hans-Georg BIOTRONIK SE & Co. KG Corporate Intellectual Properties Woermannkehre 1 12359 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 17188073.5 | 28.08.2017 | [2018/50] | Priority number, date | US201762516689P | 08.06.2017 Original published format: US 201762516689 P | [2018/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3412337 | Date: | 12.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/375, A61N1/372, // A61N1/05, A61B5/00 | [2018/50] | CPC: |
A61N1/0573 (EP,US);
A61B5/6882 (EP,US);
A61N1/3706 (US);
A61N1/37518 (EP,US);
A61N1/3756 (EP,US);
A61B5/6852 (EP,US);
A61B5/686 (EP,US);
A61B5/6862 (EP,US);
A61N1/059 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/29] |
Former [2018/50] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZINKENANORDNUNG MIT FLEXIBLEM BAND, INSBESONDERE FÜR EINEN IMPLANTIERBAREN HERZSCHRITTMACHER | [2018/50] | English: | FLEXIBLE BAND TINE ARRAY, PARTICULARLY FOR AN IMPLANTABLE CARDIAC PACEMAKER | [2018/50] | French: | RÉ?SEAU DE DENTS DE BANDE FLEXIBLE, EN PARTICULIER POUR UN STIMULATEUR CARDIAQUE IMPLANTABLE | [2018/50] | Examination procedure | 06.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/29] | 06.06.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/45] | 24.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XPI]US2017209688 (DRAKE RONALD A [US], et al) [XP] 1-6,8-13 * paragraphs [0040] - [0048]; figures 1-4A * [I] 7; | [X]US2011270340 (PELLEGRINI GIANFRANCO [US], et al) [X] 1,11-13 * paragraphs [0050] - [0054]; figures 19-27 *; | [X]US2011251660 (GRISWOLD ERIK [US]) [X] 1,9-13 * paragraphs [0016] - [0023]; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2012172690 (ANDERSON THOMAS A [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0028] - [0031] - [0047] - [0058] - [0069] - [0075]; figures 1, 3A-6H *; | [A]US2016059003 (EGGEN MICHAEL D [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract *; | [A]US2009082828 (OSTROFF ALAN [US]) [A] 1-13 * abstract * | by applicant | US2012172892 |