EP3269294 - AN INSTRUMENT FOR ENDOSCOPIC APPLICATIONS OR THE LIKE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.12.2018 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.01.2019 [2019/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fortimedix Surgical B.V. Daelderweg 20 6361 HK Nuth / NL | [2018/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Verbeek, Marcel Antonius Elisabeth Bergseweg 71 6367 HA Voerendaal / NL | [2018/03] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2018/03] | Application number, filing date | 17189085.8 | 18.04.2008 | [2018/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3269294 | Date: | 17.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/005, A61M25/00, A61M25/01, // A61B17/00 | [2018/03] | CPC: |
A61B1/005 (EP,US);
A61B1/0055 (EP,KR,US);
A61B1/00135 (EP,KR,US);
A61B1/0052 (EP,KR,US);
A61B1/009 (KR,US);
A61B1/045 (KR);
A61B17/00234 (US);
A61M25/0045 (EP,KR,US);
A61M25/0054 (EP,KR,US);
A61M25/0136 (EP,KR,US);
A61M25/0138 (EP,KR,US);
A61M25/0147 (EP,KR,US);
B25J18/06 (KR,US);
A61B2017/00309 (EP,KR,US);
A61M2025/0161 (EP,KR,US);
Y10T74/20323 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/03] | Title | German: | INSTRUMENT FÜR ENDOSKOPISCHE ANWENDUNGEN ODER DERGLEICHEN | [2018/03] | English: | AN INSTRUMENT FOR ENDOSCOPIC APPLICATIONS OR THE LIKE | [2018/03] | French: | INSTRUMENT POUR APPLICATIONS ENDOSCOPIQUES OU SIMILAIRES | [2018/03] | Examination procedure | 01.09.2017 | Examination requested [2018/03] | 01.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/03] | 31.08.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/03] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08748988.6 / EP2262408 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 01.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 18.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2284242 (WOLF GMBH RICHARD [DE]) [A] 1-16* figures 1, 2 *; | [XI]US2004236316 (DANITZ DAVID J [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * figures 1A-1E, 2A-2D, 3C-3E * * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0056] * [I] 16; | [A]US2007021737 (LEE WOOJIN [US]) [A] 1-16 * figure 25 *; | [A]US2007282371 (LEE WOOJIN [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * figures 1, 2, 2A, 5, 9, 10 * | by applicant | EP1708609 | EP20080004373 |