EP3287484 - CYCLOHEXANE-1,2,4-TRICARBOXYLIC ACID TRIPENTYLESTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 18.06.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 21.07.2021 [2021/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evonik Operations GmbH Rellinghauser Straße 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | [2019/50] |
Former [2018/09] | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Rellinghauser Straße 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Woldt, Benjamin Alte Bahnhofstraße 121A 44892 Bochum / DE | 02 /
Grass, Michael Mosskamp 21b 45721 Haltern am See / DE | 03 /
Boeck, Florian Frauenstraße 30 48143 Münster / DE | [2018/09] | Representative(s) | Evonik Patent Association c/o Evonik Industries AG IP Management Bau 1042A/PB 15 Paul-Baumann-Straße 1 45772 Marl / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 17189749.9 | 25.08.2016 | [2018/09] | Priority number, date | EP20150187128 | 28.09.2015 Original published format: EP 15187128 | [2018/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3287484 | Date: | 28.02.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/00, C08K5/12, C08L27/06, C07C69/75, C07C67/303 | [2018/09] | CPC: |
C08K5/12 (EP,CN,US);
C08K5/0016 (EP,KR,US);
C07C67/08 (US);
C07C67/12 (EP,US);
C07C69/76 (KR,US);
C08K5/11 (KR);
C08L1/18 (CN);
C08L23/34 (CN);
C08L27/06 (CN,KR);
C08L29/14 (CN);
C08L33/10 (CN);
C08L67/04 (CN);
C08L75/04 (CN)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C67/12, C07C69/76 (EP,US);
C08K5/12, C08L27/06 (CN);
C08L27/06, C08L33/10, C08L29/14, C08L23/34, C08L75/04, C08L67/04, C08L1/18, C08K5/12 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CYCLOHEXAN-1,2,4-TRICARBONSÄURETRIPENTYLESTER | [2018/09] | English: | CYCLOHEXANE-1,2,4-TRICARBOXYLIC ACID TRIPENTYLESTER | [2018/09] | French: | ESTER TRIPENTYLIQUE DU CYCLOHEXANE-1,2,4-TRIACIDE | [2018/09] | Examination procedure | 07.09.2017 | Examination requested [2018/09] | 07.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.04.2019 | Observations by third parties | 24.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.05.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 22.04.2021 | 04.03.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/29] | 14.03.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/29] | 22.04.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16185659.6 / EP3147318 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE20021356U (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 1-4,9-13 * page 36, lines 5-6; claims 1,2 *; | [X]US2005038285 (MASCHMEYER DIETRICH [DE], et al) [X] 1-13 * paragraphs [0055] , [0060] - [0063] - [0082]; claims 1,4-6 *; | [X]US2006178446 (BEDAT JOELLE [FR], et al) [X] 1,2,9-11 * paragraphs [0024] , [0030] , [0039]; claim 1 *; | [ID]US2015246867 (CASTIGLIONI GIAN LUCA [IT], et al) [ID] 1-13* paragraph [0117]; claim 41 * | by applicant | DE2348511 | WO9107459 | EP0354700 | EP0479260 | US6284917 | JP2005230058 | US2007287781 | US7361714 | US2015246867 | - "Vinyl Plasticizers form Trimellitic Anhydride", Soc. Plastics Engrs. Techn. Papers., (19620000), vol. 8, no. 22, pages 1,1 - 9 | - VON A.S. WILSON, "Plasticizers - Principles and Practice", The Institute of Materials, (19950000), pages 166 - 170 | other | US2007287781 | US2010305255 | US2011232825 |