EP3299850 - OPTICAL COMPONENT, SENSOR AND METHOD FOR MEASURING AN ELONGATION AND/OR A TEMPERATURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.02.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.11.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastr. 27c 80686 München / DE | [2022/16] |
Former [2018/13] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastraße 27c 80686 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bethmann, Konrad Papendieksfeld 21 30966 Hemmingen / DE | 02 /
Schade, Wolfgang Zum Bohrfeld 6 38644 Goslar / DE | 03 /
Köhring, Michael Walkenrieder Straße 18 37441 Bad Sachsa / DE | [2018/13] | Representative(s) | Friese Goeden Patentanwälte PartGmbB Widenmayerstraße 49 80538 München / DE | [2018/13] | Application number, filing date | 17189883.6 | 07.09.2017 | [2018/13] | Priority number, date | DE201610218067 | 21.09.2016 Original published format: DE102016218067 | [2018/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3299850 | Date: | 28.03.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3299850 | Date: | 23.05.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3299850 | Date: | 31.07.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/125, G01B11/16, G02B1/00, G01L1/24, G02F1/00, G01K11/00, G02B6/122, G01K5/48 | [2024/12] | CPC: |
G02B1/002 (EP,US);
G01B11/16 (EP,US);
G01D5/35341 (US);
G01D5/3537 (US);
G01K11/00 (EP,US);
G01K5/48 (EP,US);
G01L1/241 (EP,US);
G02B6/125 (EP,US);
G02B6/26 (US);
|
Former IPC [2018/13] | G02B1/00, G02B6/122, G01K5/48, G01K11/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/52] |
Former [2018/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | OPTISCHE KOMPONENTE, SENSOR UND VERFAHREN ZUR MESSUNG EINER DEHNUNG UND/ODER EINER TEMPERATUR | [2018/13] | English: | OPTICAL COMPONENT, SENSOR AND METHOD FOR MEASURING AN ELONGATION AND/OR A TEMPERATURE | [2018/13] | French: | COMPOSANT OPTIQUE, CAPTEUR ET PROCÉDÉ DE MESURE D'UN ALLONGEMENT ET/OU D'UNE TEMPÉRATURE | [2018/13] | Examination procedure | 21.11.2018 | Examination requested [2018/52] | 21.11.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.11.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2004017111 (UNIV SWINBURNE [AU], et al); | [XI]US2005117866 (PARK WOUNJHANG [US], et al); | [XI]US2009323014 (CUNNINGHAM BRIAN T [US], et al); |