Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6834823B | Global Dossier | 24.02.2021 | B2 | JP2018092583 | 14.06.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2016175789 | 08.09.2016 | JP2016228771 | 25.11.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10275192 | Global Dossier | 30.04.2019 | B2 | US2018067704 | 08.03.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2017139328 | 18.07.2017 | JP2016175789 | 08.09.2016 | JP2016228771 | 25.11.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107807802B | Global Dossier | 20.08.2021 | B | CN107807802 | 16.03.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2017139328 | 18.07.2017 | JP2016175789 | 08.09.2016 | JP2016228771 | 25.11.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3293627 | Global Dossier | 14.03.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2017139328 | 18.07.2017 | JP2016175789 | 08.09.2016 | JP2016228771 | 25.11.2016 |