EP3453848 - STEAM TURBINE WITH TAP CHAMBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.01.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.02.2020 [2020/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2019/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Holder, Martina Krekelerhang 12 45276 Essen / DE | 02 /
Kostenko, Yevgen Altdorferstr. 18 40878 Ratingen / DE | 03 /
Myschi, Oliver Steinenkamp 18 47137 Duisburg / DE | 04 /
Zander, Uwe Denkhauser Höfe 196 e 45475 Mülheim an der Ruhr / DE | [2019/11] | Application number, filing date | 17190075.6 | 08.09.2017 | [2019/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3453848 | Date: | 13.03.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F01D25/26, F01D17/10 | [2019/11] | CPC: |
F01D25/26 (EP);
F01D17/105 (EP);
F05D2220/31 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DAMPFTURBINE MIT ANZAPFKAMMER | [2019/11] | English: | STEAM TURBINE WITH TAP CHAMBER | [2019/11] | French: | TURBINE À VAPEUR DOTÉE D'UNE CHAMBRE DE PIQUAGE | [2019/11] | Examination procedure | 14.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/07] | 27.09.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/07] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2019 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS60169607 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [XY]JPH055403 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * [Y] 9; | [I]EP2101044 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [I] 1 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0019]; figure - *; | [A]EP2101042 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-12* the whole document *; | [XY]US2016312636 (IMAI SHUNJI [JP]) [X] 1-6,8,12 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0045]; figure - * [Y] 9; | [A]EP3128134 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document * |