EP3441836 - ALGORITHM AND METHOD FOR DETECTING FAULTS OF A MACHINE BASED ON MACHINE-LEARNING TECHNIQUE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ulala Lab, Inc. Gwanyang-dong 505-ho 11-41, Simin-daero 327beon-gil Dongan-gu Anyang-si, Gyeonggi-do 14055 / KR | [2019/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kang, Hak Ju ULALA LAB. INC. (Gwanyang-dong), 614-ho, Creative Economy Convergence Center, 11-41, Simin-daero 327beon-gil, Dongan-gu Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 14055 / KR | [2019/07] | Representative(s) | Beck Greener LLP Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [2023/43] |
Former [2019/07] | Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | Application number, filing date | 17190197.8 | 08.09.2017 | [2019/07] | Priority number, date | KR20170101433 | 10.08.2017 Original published format: KR 20170101433 | [2019/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3441836 | Date: | 13.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3441836 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G05B23/02 | [2019/07] | CPC: |
G05B23/0235 (EP,US);
G06F11/07 (KR);
G06N20/00 (KR,US);
G05B23/02 (KR);
G06F11/0703 (US);
G06F16/00 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ALGORITHMUS UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERKENNUNG VON FEHLER EINER MASCHINE BASIEREND AUF MASCHINENLERNTECHNIK | [2023/17] | English: | ALGORITHM AND METHOD FOR DETECTING FAULTS OF A MACHINE BASED ON MACHINE-LEARNING TECHNIQUE | [2019/07] | French: | ALGORITHME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR DÉTECTER DES DÉFAUTS D'UNE MACHINE SUR LA BASE D'UNE TECHNIQUE D'APPRENTISSAGE AUTOMATIQUE | [2019/07] |
Former [2019/07] | ALGORITHMUS UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERKENNUNG VON FEHLERN EINER MASCHINE BASIEREND AUF MASCHINENLERNTECHNIK | Examination procedure | deleted | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.09.2017 | Examination requested [2019/07] | 18.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 09.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 26.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.10.2023 | CZ | 25.10.2023 | DK | 25.10.2023 | EE | 25.10.2023 | ES | 25.10.2023 | HR | 25.10.2023 | IT | 25.10.2023 | LT | 25.10.2023 | LV | 25.10.2023 | NL | 25.10.2023 | PL | 25.10.2023 | RO | 25.10.2023 | RS | 25.10.2023 | SE | 25.10.2023 | SK | 25.10.2023 | SM | 25.10.2023 | BG | 25.01.2024 | NO | 25.01.2024 | GR | 26.01.2024 | IS | 25.02.2024 | PT | 26.02.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
CZ | 25.10.2023 | ||
DK | 25.10.2023 | ||
EE | 25.10.2023 | ||
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RO | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
SM | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
DK | 25.10.2023 | ||
EE | 25.10.2023 | ||
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
SM | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
DK | 25.10.2023 | ||
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
SM | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 25.10.2023 | |
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 25.10.2023 | |
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 25.10.2023 | |
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 25.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005102426 (HAMM GREGORY P [US], et al) [A] 1,15* page 1 - page 3 *; | [A]WO2013113379 (ABB RESEARCH LTD [CH], et al) [A] 1,15 * page 19 - page 20 *; | [I]US2017139398 (TSUZUKI TOSHIYUKI [JP], et al) [I] 1-15 * page 1 - page 12; figures 4, 6 * | Examination | US2015006972 |