EP3293238 - INK WITH IMPROVED TRANSFER EFFICIENCY AT LOW TEMPERATURE FOR DIGITAL OFFSET PRINTING APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.07.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.09.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.08.2019 [2019/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Mailstop: XRX2-020 100 Clinton Avenue South Rochester, NY 14644 / US | For all designated states Palo Alto Research Center, Incorporated 3333 Coyote Hill Road Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | [2018/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAYO, James D. 2033 Courtland Crescent Mississauga, Ontario, L4Y 1V1 / CA | 02 /
MAGDALINIS, Aurelian Valeriu 393 Spruce Grove Crescent Newmarket, Ontario, L3X 2X3 / CA | 03 /
STOWE, Timothy D. 3208 San Jose Avenue Alameda, CA California 94501 / US | 04 /
ALLEN, C. Geoffrey 8 Heathfield Crescent Waterdown, Ontario, Ontario L0R 2H5 / CA | 05 /
ABRAHAM, Biby E. 3377 Fountain Park Avenue Mississauga, Ontario L5M 7E2 / CA | 06 /
BRETON, Marcel P. 2080 Leanne Boulevard, Unit 53 Mississauga, Ontario, L5K 2S6 / CA | 07 /
LEE, Jonathan Siu-Chung 2128 Munn's Avenue Oakville, Ontario L6H 4K4 / CA | [2018/11] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/11] | BRP Renaud & Partner mbB Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Steuerberater Königstraße 28 70173 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 17190251.3 | 08.09.2017 | [2018/11] | Priority number, date | US201615262750 | 12.09.2016 Original published format: US201615262750 | [2018/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3293238 | Date: | 14.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C09D11/03, C09D11/037, C09D11/101 | [2018/11] | CPC: |
C09D11/03 (EP,US);
G03F7/0002 (US);
B41F7/02 (US);
C09D11/037 (EP,US);
C09D11/101 (EP,US);
C09D11/107 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/43] |
Former [2018/11] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TINTE MIT VERBESSERTER ÜBERTRAGUNGSEFFIZIENZ BEI NIEDRIGER TEMPERATUR FÜR DIGITALE OFFSETDRUCKANWENDUNGEN | [2018/11] | English: | INK WITH IMPROVED TRANSFER EFFICIENCY AT LOW TEMPERATURE FOR DIGITAL OFFSET PRINTING APPLICATIONS | [2018/11] | French: | ENCRE AYANT UNE EFFICACITÉ DE TRANSFERT AMÉLIORÉE À BASSE TEMPÉRATURE POUR DES APPLICATIONS D'IMPRESSION OFFSET NUMÉRIQUE | [2018/11] | Examination procedure | 08.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.09.2018 | Examination requested [2018/43] | 03.07.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/32] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2014340455 (BRETON MARCEL [CA], et al) [X] 1-10 * example -; table - *; | [X]US2015197647 (BIRAU MIHAELA MARIA [CA], et al) [X] 1-10 * example -; table - *; | [X]US2016222231 (ALLEN C GEOFFREY [CA], et al) [X] 1-10 * example -; table - *; | [X]US2016230027 (BIRAU MIHAELA MARIA [CA], et al) [X] 1-10 * example -; table - *; | [X]US2016257829 (BRETON MARCEL P [CA], et al) [X] 1-10* example -; table - * |