EP3453497 - HAIR REMOVAL DEVICE FOR PUBIC HAIR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.01.2020 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.02.2020 [2020/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Gillette Company LLC One Gillette Park Boston, MA 02127 / US | [2019/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HODGSON, Matthew James Gillette Management LLC, Reading Innovation Centre 460 Basingstoke Road Reading, Berkshire RG2 0QE / GB | 02 /
KEARNEY, Robert Andrew Gillette Management LLC 460 Basingstoke Road Reading, Berkshire RG2 0QE / GB | 03 /
WARRICK, Paul Leslie Gillette Management LLC 460 Basingstoke Road Reading, Berkshire RG2 0QE / GB | [2019/11] | Representative(s) | Hoyng Rokh Monegier B.V. Rembrandt Tower, 30th Floor Amstelplein 1 1096 HA Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2019/11] | Hoyng Rokh Monegier LLP Rembrandt Tower, 31st Floor Amstelplein 1 1096 HA Amsterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 17190396.6 | 11.09.2017 | [2019/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3453497 | Date: | 13.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.2018 | Classification | IPC: | B26B21/40, B26B21/52 | [2019/11] | CPC: |
B26B21/4012 (EP);
B26B21/4031 (EP);
B26B21/52 (EP);
B26B21/522 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HAARENTFERNUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR SCHAMHAAR | [2019/11] | English: | HAIR REMOVAL DEVICE FOR PUBIC HAIR | [2019/11] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ÉPILATION POUR POILS PUBIENS | [2019/11] | Examination procedure | 14.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/07] | 29.09.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/07] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2019 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]US2014026424 (OGLESBY OLIVER DAVID [GB], et al) [I] 1-7 * paragraph [0053] * [Y] 1-7; | [IY]EP2537649 (GILLETTE CO [US]) [I] 1-7 * paragraph [0018] * [Y] 1-7; | [Y]WO9717174 (GILLETTE CO [US], et al) [Y] 1-7 * page 4, line 9 - line 17 *; | [Y]US2005198830 (WALKER VINCENT P [US], et al) [Y] 1-7 * paragraphs [0087] , [0099] *; | [XA]US2014230256 (CHRISTIE VANESSA [US], et al) [X] 8,10,12,14 * paragraph [0068] * [A] 9,11,13; | [XA]US2016288349 (BARRETT TOD [US], et al) [X] 8,12-14 * paragraph [0062] * [A] 9-11; | [XA]US2004177518 (LEVENTHAL JAMES M [US]) [X] 8,9,11 * paragraphs [0017] , [0020] * [A] 10,12-14 | by applicant | WO2012061343 | US7607230 | US7024776 | US2008034590 | US2009049695 | EP0722379 |