EP3453743 - METHOD FOR PRODUCTION OF AT LEAST ONE TANNIC PRODUCT AND A BARK PRODUCT WITH ENHANCED FUEL VALUE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.10.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.11.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.08.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.09.2019 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Södra Skogsägarna Ekonomiska Förening Skogsudden 351 89 Växjö / SE | [2019/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOLHAGE, Fredrik Ljunglidsgatan 7, lgh 1101 504 58 BORÅS / SE | 02 /
MESIC, Narcis Studentvägen 1 432 50 VARBERG / SE | [2019/11] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB P.O. Box 11394 404 28 Göteborg / SE | [2019/11] | Application number, filing date | 17190555.7 | 12.09.2017 | [2019/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3453743 | Date: | 13.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3453743 | Date: | 16.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C08L99/00 | [2019/11] | CPC: |
C08L99/00 (EP,US);
C10L5/442 (US);
C08H6/00 (US);
C10L2200/0469 (US);
C10L2290/08 (US);
Y02E50/10 (EP);
Y02E50/30 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/42] |
Former [2019/11] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | METHODE ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON WENIGSTENS EINEM TANNINPRPODUKT UND EINEM RINDENPRODUKT MIT ERHÖHTER ENERGIEGEHALT | [2019/11] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCTION OF AT LEAST ONE TANNIC PRODUCT AND A BARK PRODUCT WITH ENHANCED FUEL VALUE | [2019/11] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'AU MOINS UN PRODUIT TANNIQUE ET PRODUIT D'ÉCORCE AYANT UNE VALEUR DE CARBURANT AMÉLIORÉE | [2019/11] | Examination procedure | 10.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.09.2019 | Examination requested [2019/42] | 10.09.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.11.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP20213529.9 / EP3825362 | Opposition(s) | 17.09.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.09.2017 | AL | 16.12.2020 | CY | 16.12.2020 | CZ | 16.12.2020 | EE | 16.12.2020 | ES | 16.12.2020 | HR | 16.12.2020 | LT | 16.12.2020 | MC | 16.12.2020 | MK | 16.12.2020 | MT | 16.12.2020 | NL | 16.12.2020 | PL | 16.12.2020 | RO | 16.12.2020 | RS | 16.12.2020 | SI | 16.12.2020 | SK | 16.12.2020 | SM | 16.12.2020 | BG | 16.03.2021 | GR | 17.03.2021 | IS | 16.04.2021 | PT | 16.04.2021 | IE | 12.09.2021 | LU | 12.09.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 12.09.2017 | |
AL | 16.12.2020 | ||
CY | 16.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
ES | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
MC | 16.12.2020 | ||
MK | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SI | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
IE | 12.09.2021 | ||
LU | 12.09.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 12.09.2017 | |
AL | 16.12.2020 | ||
CY | 16.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
ES | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
MC | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SI | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
IE | 12.09.2021 | ||
LU | 12.09.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 16.12.2020 | |
CY | 16.12.2020 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
ES | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
MC | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SI | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
IE | 12.09.2021 | ||
LU | 12.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 16.12.2020 | |
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
ES | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
MC | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SI | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
IE | 12.09.2021 | ||
LU | 12.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 16.12.2020 | |
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
ES | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
MC | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SI | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
LU | 12.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AL | 16.12.2020 | |
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
ES | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
MC | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SI | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 16.12.2020 | |
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
ES | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SI | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 16.12.2020 | |
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
ES | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 16.12.2020 | |
CZ | 16.12.2020 | ||
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | CZ | 16.12.2020 | |
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
IS | 16.04.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | CZ | 16.12.2020 | |
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
PL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | CZ | 16.12.2020 | |
EE | 16.12.2020 | ||
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | CZ | 16.12.2020 | |
HR | 16.12.2020 | ||
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RO | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SK | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HR | 16.12.2020 | |
LT | 16.12.2020 | ||
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
PT | 16.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HR | 16.12.2020 | |
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
SM | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/30] | HR | 16.12.2020 | |
NL | 16.12.2020 | ||
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | HR | 16.12.2020 | |
RS | 16.12.2020 | ||
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | RS | 16.12.2020 | |
BG | 16.03.2021 | ||
GR | 17.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | RS | 16.12.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]GB2063856 (NEW ZEALAND FOREST PROD) [XD] 1-15 * page 6, line 45 - page 7, line 45; figure 1; claims 29-31 *; | [Y]CA1285555 (COMMW SCIENT AND IND RESEACH O [AU]) [Y] 1-15* example 1 *; | [Y]US5417888 (COLLINS PETER J [AU], et al) [Y] 1-15 * example 1 * | by applicant | GB2063856 | US5238680 | US5756098 | EP1071842 |