Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10595174 | Global Dossier | 17.03.2020 | B2 | US2019082313 | 14.03.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP17190865 | 13.09.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN109495862B | Global Dossier | 08.12.2023 | B | CN109495862 | 19.03.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | EP17190865 | 13.09.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3457663 | Global Dossier | 07.04.2021 | B1 | EP3457663 | 20.03.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP17190865 | 13.09.2017 |