EP3295994 - ROPING HARNESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.02.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.03.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.11.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.09.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zedel Zone Industrielle de Crolles Cidex 105A 38920 Crolles / FR | [2018/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLONDEAU, Loïc 18 quai charpenay 38700 La Tronche / FR | [2018/12] | Representative(s) | Talbot, Alexandre Cabinet Hecké 28 Cours Jean Jaurès 38000 Grenoble / FR | [2018/12] | Application number, filing date | 17191096.1 | 14.09.2017 | [2018/12] | Priority number, date | FR20160058711 | 16.09.2016 Original published format: FR 1658711 | [2018/12] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3295994 | Date: | 21.03.2018 | Language: | FR | [2018/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3295994 | Date: | 24.04.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A62B35/00 | [2018/12] | CPC: |
A62B35/0025 (EP,US);
A63B29/02 (CN);
A62B35/0031 (US);
A62B35/0012 (US);
A63B69/0048 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/44] |
Former [2018/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SEILGURTZEUG | [2018/12] | English: | ROPING HARNESS | [2018/12] | French: | HARNAIS D'ENCORDEMENT | [2018/12] | Examination procedure | 14.09.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.09.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.09.2018 | Examination requested [2018/44] | 20.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 13.03.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.01.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/14] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.09.2017 | AL | 24.04.2019 | AT | 24.04.2019 | CY | 24.04.2019 | CZ | 24.04.2019 | DK | 24.04.2019 | EE | 24.04.2019 | ES | 24.04.2019 | FI | 24.04.2019 | HR | 24.04.2019 | IT | 24.04.2019 | LT | 24.04.2019 | LV | 24.04.2019 | MK | 24.04.2019 | MT | 24.04.2019 | NL | 24.04.2019 | PL | 24.04.2019 | RO | 24.04.2019 | RS | 24.04.2019 | SE | 24.04.2019 | SI | 24.04.2019 | SK | 24.04.2019 | SM | 24.04.2019 | TR | 24.04.2019 | BG | 24.07.2019 | NO | 24.07.2019 | GR | 25.07.2019 | IS | 24.08.2019 | PT | 24.08.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 14.09.2017 | |
AL | 24.04.2019 | ||
AT | 24.04.2019 | ||
CY | 24.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
MT | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
SI | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
SM | 24.04.2019 | ||
TR | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 14.09.2017 | |
AL | 24.04.2019 | ||
AT | 24.04.2019 | ||
CY | 24.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
SI | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
SM | 24.04.2019 | ||
TR | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
AT | 24.04.2019 | ||
CY | 24.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
SI | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
SM | 24.04.2019 | ||
TR | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
AT | 24.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
SI | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
SM | 24.04.2019 | ||
TR | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
AT | 24.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
SM | 24.04.2019 | ||
TR | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
AT | 24.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
SM | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
AT | 24.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
AT | 24.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
AT | 24.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 24.04.2019 | |
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 24.04.2019 | |
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
NL | 24.04.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/44] | NL | 24.04.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2011107676 (ZEDEL [FR], et al) [A] 1-11* the whole document *; | [A]EP3006089 (ZEDEL [FR]) [A] 1-11 * figures 1-3 * * paragraphs [0001] , [0006] - [0007] - [0012] * |